This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:21:36 (UTC).

Graciella Tapia vs Gustavo Galvan/UD

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Graciella Tapia filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Gustavo Galvan/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1515

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tapia, Graciella

Defendant

Galvan, Gustavo

Other

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tapia, Graciella

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE327681.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Matter taken off calendar for 02/24/2014. Judgment entered sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Restitution of premises jgm- Comment: Judgment entered pursuant to CCP 1169 for plaintiff(s) Graciella Tapia against defendant(s) Gustavo Galvan on 01/24/2014 for restitution of the premises only 4527 E Woodward #111, Fresno CA 93725 sr (copies in tickler T)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Gustavo Galvan sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of DOES 1 to 10 ONLY defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: W/JUDGMENT MM

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2013
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Hispanic Male 35 years old, mailed on 12/19/2013 . sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from GUAGMNU on 19-DEC-2013 by CYBARRA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from GUAGMNU on 19-DEC-2013 by CYBARRA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCE323970.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on UD Complaint filed. ed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by EDUQUE.

    Read MoreRead Less