This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 18:58:18 (UTC).

Gracie Soto vs. Saint Agnes Medical Center/COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 05/13/2015 Gracie Soto filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Saint Agnes Medical Center/COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Gaab, Kimberly and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1529

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Gaab, Kimberly

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Soto, Gracie

Soto, Ulysses

Stephens, Jasmine

Estate of Francisco Soto

Defendants

Saint Agnes Medical Center

Chaudhry, Pervaiz A., Medical Doctor

Cohler, Larry, Medical Doctor

Pamula, Ramesh B., Medical Doctor

Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group

Chaudhry Medical, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

West, James

Defendant Attorneys

Pai, Anil

GOODMAN, JAMES M

Thelen, Dennis R.

Pollara, Dominique A.

 

Court Documents

Order Received for Signature

01123477.pdf; Comment: Chaudhry Defs: PO/Demurrer/SAC

Request for Judical Notice

Request for Judical Notice

Motion filed

Motion; Comment: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT BY LARRY COHLER, M.D.; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Notice of Hearing

01123472.pdf; Comment: Chaudhry Defs Notice of Hearing on Demurrer SAC

Answer Filed

Civil Document

Declaration Filed

MTS TAC - BNE Decl. (01140970x9DEF9).pdf; Comment: of Barry Endick re Motion to Strike Portions of Third Amended Complaint

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

Declaration Filed

01133721.pdf; Comment: Declaration of BNE re CCP 430.41(a)(2)

Request for Dismissal of entire action.pdf

12/27/2018: Request for Dismissal of entire action.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

11/26/2018: Minute Order Attachment

Declaration of Jeffrey S. Mitchell, Esq..pdf

11/06/2018: Declaration of Jeffrey S. Mitchell, Esq..pdf

Notice of Hearing

08/16/2018: Notice of Hearing

Notice

08/13/2018: Notice

NOE of Dismissal (Soto).pdf

08/07/2018: NOE of Dismissal (Soto).pdf

Request for Dismissal (Soto).pdf

08/06/2018: Request for Dismissal (Soto).pdf

NOE of GFS (Soto).pdf

07/30/2018: NOE of GFS (Soto).pdf

Order - Good Faith Settlement

07/24/2018: Order - Good Faith Settlement

342 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Soto, Gracie; Saint Agnes Medical Center; Soto, Ulysses; Stephens, Jasmine; Estate of Francisco Soto; Chaudhry, Pervaiz A., Medical Doctor; Cohler, Larry, Medical Doctor; Pamula, Ramesh B., Medical Doctor; Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group; Chaudhry Medical, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: from Chambers and Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Jeffrey S. Mitchell, Esq. in Response to Notice of Dismissal Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 225 on November 28, 2018 at 3:30 PM in Department 503

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party; Names: Chaudhry, Pervaiz A., Medical Doctor; Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group; Chaudhry Medical, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
269 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Filed; Comment: for Oral Argument re: Plaintiffs' Request for Porduction, Sets 8 and 10, to Deft. Community Regional Medical Center and Discovery Privileges

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Errata

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Soto, Gracie: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00005072 Eddings Attorney Support $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Soto, Gracie: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • FinancialFinancial: Soto, Gracie; Total Financial Assessment $665.00; Total Payments and Credits $665.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cohler, Larry, Medical Doctor is a litigant