This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:23:37 (UTC).

Gloria Nazzaretta vs County of Fresno

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Gloria Nazzaretta filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against County of Fresno. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark and Snauffer, Mark W. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3843

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Snauffer, Mark W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nazzaretta, Gloria

Defendants

County of Fresno

Lara, Roxanne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Goldberg, Michael

Goldberg Law Firm 925 "N" Street, Ste 130

Fresno, CA 93721

Defendant Attorney

Linden, Michael R.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Nazzaretta, Gloria; County of Fresno; Lara, Roxanne; Snauffer, Mark W

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Nazzaretta, Gloria; County of Fresno; Lara, Roxanne; Snauffer, Mark W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conditional Settlement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Case Status Review- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:04 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 25-MAR-2015 by JVERBERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 25-MAR-2015 by JVERBERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • CRC225 Dismissal Hrg Minutes- Comment: 225 Dismissal hearing continued to 5/21/15 at 10:00 a.m. in Dept. 401 for: CSR IH 03/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • Continued 225 Dismissal- Hearing Time: 01:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 16-DEC-2013 by SAMGARCIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt CVCE185110.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. sg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: sg Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet sg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Nazzaretta, Gloria: Counter Payment Receipt # 185110 Nazzaretta, Gloria $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Nazzaretta, Gloria: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial: Nazzaretta, Gloria; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less