This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/23/2019 at 19:56:28 (UTC).

Gilberto Trejo vs.Cemex, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2016 Gilberto Trejo filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Cemex, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, Donald, Simpson, Alan, Dalesandro, Samuel, Gaab, Kimberly, Snauffer, Mark and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2398

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Black, Donald

Simpson, Alan

Dalesandro, Samuel

Gaab, Kimberly

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trejo, Gilberto

an individual on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated

Defendants

Cemex Construction Materials Pacific, LLC

Cemex, Inc.

a Delaware Limited liability Company

Cemex, Inc.a Louisiana Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Haines, Paul K

Defendant Attorney

Liu, Dorothy S.

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Notice of Entry of Order

Declaration Filed

2018-01-16 Oreilly Decl ISO PAGA Approval.pdf; Comment: Decl of O'Reilly

Declaration Filed

2018-01-16 AJRDecl ISO PAGA Approval.pdf; Comment: Decl of Andrew J. Rowbotham

Notice of Change of Address Filed

2017-12-18 NTC of Address Change (Cemex).pdf; Comment: Notice of Address Change??

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Defendants Cemex, Inc. And Cemex Construction Materials Pacific, Llcs' Answer To First Amended Complaint

Proof of Service

2016-12-19 POS of FAC Cemex Cons.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

2016-12-19 POS of FAC Cemex, Inc.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

2016-09-09 POSOS Cemex Construction Materials.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: Clerk's certificate of mailing attached.

Stipulation and Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: protective order re: employee information

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: Forwarded (on 1/29/18) to Dept: 503 Order: Stipulated Protective Order Re Employee Information Forwarded to 4th Floor clerk's office for further processing.

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 503 on 6/26/17 Order for: Stipulation and Order Protective Order Forwarded to 4th Floor Clerk's office for further processing.

Case Management Statement Filed

2017-01-13 P's CM Statement.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

2016-12-19 POS of FAC Cemex Cons.pdf; Comment: as to Frist Amended Complaint - Cemex Construction Materials Pacific, LLC

Order Received for Signature

2016-11-21 App. & Order to Continue CMC.pdf; Comment: Forwarded to Dept:503 on 11/28/16 Order for:Application and Order to Continue or Vacate Case Mangement Conference

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Trejo, Gilberto; Cemex, Inc.a Louisiana Corporation; Cemex Construction Materials Pacific, LLC; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 3- 15 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)- Civil Document; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Motion - Final Approval Class Settlement- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Uncontested; Comment: Fletcher Scmidt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- 2018-04-17 NTC of Filing Exe Settlement Agt.pdf; Comment: Notice of Filing of Fully-Executed Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- 2018-04-11 POS.pdf; Comment: re: notice of motion and supporting documents

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2018
  • Financial info for Trejo, Gilberto: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Financial info for Trejo, Gilberto: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-04328 Trejo, Gilberto $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Financial info for Trejo, Gilberto: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Financial info for Trejo, Gilberto: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-53923 Trejo, Gilberto $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Financial info for Trejo, Gilberto: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Financial info for Trejo, Gilberto: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-34589 Trejo, Gilberto $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Financial info for Trejo, Gilberto: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Financial info for Trejo, Gilberto: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-31960 Trejo, Gilberto $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Financial info for Trejo, Gilberto: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Financial: Trejo, Gilberto; Total Financial Assessment $725.00; Total Payments and Credits $725.00

    Read MoreRead Less