This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/06/2018 at 16:46:51 (UTC).

Giacalone Electrical vs Calstar Industr\judgment

Case Summary

On 02/02/2009 Giacalone Electrical filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Calstar Industr judgment. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Simpson, Alan. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0329

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Giacalone Electrical Services Inc

Defendant

Calstar Industries Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tipton, Debra G

 

Court Documents

Historical Documents

Historical Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2009
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Historical Documents- Historical Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CVCE132466.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. CVCE 132466 KEC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. CVCE 132466 KEC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • Notice filed- Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. dsw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • 60-Day Continued CMC- Original Type: 60-Day Continued CMC; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • Returned mail-no address found- Comment: Case Management Conference Minutes/Order returned by Post Office, no new address found for Debra G Tipton Document and envelope placed in file. jan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CMC scheduled for 10-5-09 judgment. sg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2009
  • Case Management Conf Minutes- Comment: Case Management Conference continued to 10/5/09 at 10:00 am in Dept 97E . Reason:Judgment to be obtained TLC

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2009
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 02-FEB-2009 by LESPARZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Original Complaint filed. le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: le Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • Financial info for Giacalone Electrical Services Inc: Counter Payment Receipt # 132466 Giacalone Electrical Services Inc $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • Financial info for Giacalone Electrical Services Inc: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • Financial info for Giacalone Electrical Services Inc: Counter Payment Receipt # 120252 Giacalone Electrical Services Inc $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • Financial info for Giacalone Electrical Services Inc: Transaction Assessment $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • Financial: Giacalone Electrical Services Inc; Total Financial Assessment $400.00; Total Payments and Credits $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Calstar Industries, Inc. is a litigant