This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/08/2018 at 13:32:02 (UTC).

George Vue vs Pao Xiong

Case Summary

On 09/02/2014 George Vue filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Pao Xiong. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark, Snauffer, Mark W and Black, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2544

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Snauffer, Mark W

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vue, George

Defendants

Xiong, Pao

1-50, DOES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elder, Michael L.

2121 Herndon Ave, Suite 103

Clovis, CA 93611-6302

Defendant Attorney

Capozzi, Anthony P

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Order signed. Forwarded to clerk's office for further processing Order Granting Motion to Withdraw

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: POS Firm Name and Address Change

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Russell D. Cook

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Russell D. Cook

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: Set Aside Request for Default

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: for Grant of Permanent Injunction and Points and Authorties in Support Thereof

Order Denied

Order Denied; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Application For Default Judgment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: case summary brief

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of related case

Request for Court Judgment

Civil Document; Comment: with judgment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Continued OSC

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of appearance

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: CRC 225 Dismissal Order; Party Names: Vue, George; Xiong, Pao; Snauffer, Mark W; Comment: without prejudice.; Comment: (No parties having appeared this case is dismissed without prejudice.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Requested by defendant with an estimated time for trial of 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing - 225 Dismissal hearing set for 8/14/17 at 1:00 PM in Room 305.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice of Entry of Order; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granted- Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Motion to be Relieved as Counsel. Effective upon the filing of the proof of service of this signed order upon the client.

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt CVCE194018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 02-SEP-2014 by CPRENDERGAST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: csp Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: csp Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Financial info for Xiong, Pao: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-11443 Xiong, Pao $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Financial info for Xiong, Pao: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Financial info for Xiong, Pao: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00005376 Capozzi, Anthony P $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Financial info for Xiong, Pao: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Financial: Xiong, Pao; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

ANTHONY P. CAPOZZI, CSBN 068525 ;=140 COUHTY LAW OFFICES OF ANTHONY P. CAPOZZI UpPsRici COURT 1233 W. SHAW AVE,, SUITE 102 ' f FRESNO, CALIFORNIA 93711 2015 HAR 20 iM0: 25 PHONE: (559) 221-0200

FAX: (559) 221-7997

EMAIL: Anthony@capozzilawoffices.com

www.capozzilawoffices.com |

ATTORNEY FOR Defendant,

PAO XIONG

GEORGE VUE, Case No.: 14CECG02544

PAO XIONG,

'\ p N

> ! [ D (SPACE BELOW FOR FILING STAMP ONLY)

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF FRESNO

% %k ok %k ok ok

Plaintiff,

DEFENDANT PAO XIONG’S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

14CECG02644 ANS

Answer Filed

PRAYER

WHEREFORE, the answering Defendant prays as follows:

1. Plaintiff takes nothing by this action; |

2. Defendant be awarded its costs of suit incurred herein; i 3. Defendant be awarded reasonable attorney’s fees to the extent permitted by law; and 4, For such other and further relief as the court deems just and properé. Respect/fully submitted, | \ Date: August Z[l_, 2015 By: ,

ANTHONY P. CAPOZZI f Attorney for Defendant PAO XIQNG

VERIFICATION OF COMPLAINT

I am a party to this action, and I have read the foregoing Answer to the Complaint for

Damages and know its contents. The matters stated in the Answer are true basedjon my own

knowledge, except as to those matters stated on information and belief, and as to :those matters I

believe them to be true. | I declare under penalty of perjury under the laws of the United States of A;merica and the State of California that the foregoing is true and correct.

Executed on this ?l day of August 2015, at 1233 West Shaw Avenue, S;uite 102,

Fresno, California.

Filed by Fresno County Superior Court

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CASE No.: 14CECG02544