This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/14/2016 at 14:21:00 (UTC).

Gary Moore Vs. Pappas & Company, A Calif Corp

Case Summary

On 07/31/2015 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by Gary Moore against Pappas Company A Calif Corp in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2427

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moore, Gary

Defendants

Pappas & Company, A Calif Corp

Pappas Family Farms Inc, A Calif Corp

Pappas Produce Sales, Inc A Calif Corp

Pappas Farms, Llc

George Pappas Farming Llc

Pappas Equipment Co. Llc

Phillon P Pappas Company Lp.

Pappas Farming Company I, Lp

Pappas Farming Company Ii, Lp

11 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party Names: Moore, Gary; Pappas & Company, a Calif Corp; Pappas Family Farms Inc, a Calif Corp; Pappas Produce Sales, Inc a Calif Corp; Pappas Farms, LLC; George Pappas Farming LLC; Pappas Equipment Co. LLC; Phillon P Pappas Company LP.,; Pappas Farming Company I, LP; Pappas Farming Company II, LP; Pappas Farming Company III LP; Pappas Farming Company IV LP.; Pappas Family Farms I, LP; Pappas Family Farms II, LP; Pappas Family Farms III, LP; Papas Family Farms IV, LP; G&L Pappas Farms LP; Pappas, George Phillon; Grissom, Rosemary; Pappas Family Farms IV, LP; Comment: with prejudice as to entire action of all parties and all causes of action with each party to bear their own attorney fees and costs

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party Names: Moore, Gary; Pappas & Company, a Calif Corp; Pappas Family Farms Inc, a Calif Corp; Pappas Produce Sales, Inc a Calif Corp; Pappas Farms, LLC; George Pappas Farming LLC; Pappas Equipment Co. LLC; Phillon P Pappas Company LP.,; Pappas Farming Company I, LP; Pappas Farming Company II, LP; Pappas Farming Company III LP; Pappas Farming Company IV LP.; Pappas Family Farms I, LP; Pappas Family Farms II, LP; Pappas Family Farms III, LP; Papas Family Farms IV, LP; G&L Pappas Farms LP; Pappas, George Phillon; Grissom, Rosemary; Pappas Family Farms IV, LP; Comment: with prejudice as to entire action of all parties and all causes of action with each party to bear their own attorney fees and costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: Case Management Conference set for November 30, 2015 at 2:30 p.m. dept 104--Case assigned to Judge Donld Black for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Financial info for Moore, Gary: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00015691 Borton $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Financial info for Moore, Gary: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Financial: Moore, Gary; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.