This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/02/2018 at 14:49:01 (UTC).

Fresno Management vs Rachel M Cabrera/UD

Case Summary

On 09/21/2012 Fresno Management filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Rachel M Cabrera/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7424

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fresno Management Company

Defendants

Cabrera, Rachel Marie

Garcia, Raul Anthony

Others

Cabrera, Rachel

All Occupants

Garcia, Raul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hrdlicka, Steven R.

Defendant Attorneys

Cabrera, Rachel Marie

Garcia, Raul Anthony

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Judgment - Restitution of Premises

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • Writ filed wholly unsatisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, wholly unsatisfied. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • Order filed- Comment: Order Amending Judgment signed by Judge Carlos Cabrera filed. It is so ordered that Raul Anthony Garcia aka Raul Garcia be added to January 14, 2013 judgment nunc pro tunc. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Order:order Forwarded to:404 (forward on 2-21-13) mk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Ex parte application to amend to judgment filed. mkDept # . Event: Ex Parte document filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 30-JAN-2013 by MMENDOZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE296186.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $5788.63 . lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • Money damages after 1169- Comment: In accordance with order signed by Judge Ikeda on 1/14/13, judgment having been previously entered pursuant to CP1169, Court orders the money damages on behalf of plaintiff Fresno Management Company against defendant Rachel Marie Cabrera aka Rachel Cabrera and Raul Anthony Garcia aka RAul Garcia in the sum of: Past due rent: $3, 722.42 Holdover damages: $301.21 Atty Fees: $1,250.00 Costs: $490.00 Total: $5,763.63 nl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • Minute order Judge Dupras- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: M.Mendoza Tape: 9:47:35 Nature of Hearing: Money Damages/granted Attorney Steven Hrdlicka is sworn and testifies. The Court takes judicial notice of rental agreement, 3-day notice and proof of service already in the court file. Order signed on the record. Notice waived. nl

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. ms Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Order granting waiver of fees- Comment: Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by clerk filed. ms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Defendant(s)/Respondent(s) in propria persona ms Event: Deft/Resp in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from GUAGMNU on 21-SEP-2012 by MSANCHEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCE284864.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 21-SEP-2012 by MSANCHEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 ms Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet ms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: ms Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA ANTHONY R