This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/01/2018 at 08:40:01 (UTC).

Fresno Credit Bureau v Juan Gomez etal

Case Summary

On 05/18/2012 Fresno Credit Bureau filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Juan Gomez etal. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0573

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fresno Credit Bureau

Defendants

Gomez, Juan A

Gomez, Regina A

Others

Gomez, Juan Andres

Gomez, Regina

Gomez, Juan

Garcia, Regina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Suhr, John D.

 

Court Documents

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed wholly unsatisfied

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed wholly unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • Satisfaction of judgment-full- Comment: Acknowledgement of full satisfaction of judgment filed. lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE299420.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $2994.09 . lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $250.00 Interest: $70.04 Costs: $52.00 lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of accrued interest filed. lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE291358. money was originally deposited into Trust on original receipt number CLCL39838 cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 11-9-12 for plaintiff Fresno Credit Bureau against defendant Juan A. Gomez aka Juan Andres Gomez aka Juan Gomez in the sum of: Principal: $2155.24 Interest: $ 113.00 Atty Fees: $ 538.81 Costs: $ 290.00 Total: $3097.05 kc

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2012
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. kc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: default packet by mail lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Juan A. Gomez kc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • Affidavit filed- Comment: Affidavit of due diligence filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Juan A. Gomez, mailed on 6/3/12. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Juan A. Gomez on 6/3/12. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCL39125.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. CM Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less