This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 03:41:56 (UTC).

Frank de Saracho vs. Ken Gallagher

Case Summary

On 09/02/2016 Frank de Saracho filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Ken Gallagher. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1992

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

de Saracho, Frank

Kaluaratchie, Charith

Defendants

Merchant, Robert

Gallagher, Susan

Gallagher, Ken

Stoen, Ken

Cabral, Monica

Riverbend MHP LLC, (Fenton & Keller, John E Kesecker)

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Party Names: de Saracho, Frank; Kaluaratchie, Charith; Gallagher, Ken; Gallagher, Susan; Merchant, Robert; Cabral, Monica; Stoen, Ken; Riverbend MHP LLC, (Fenton & Keller, John E Kesecker); Comment: with prejudice

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Robert Merchant

Amended Claim filed

Amended Claim filed; Comment: ****Adding a 6th Defendant to the claim****

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Party Names: de Saracho, Frank; Kaluaratchie, Charith; Gallagher, Ken; Gallagher, Susan; Merchant, Robert; Cabral, Monica; Stoen, Ken; Riverbend MHP LLC, (Fenton & Keller, John E Kesecker); Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Robert Merchant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Court Trial- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Defendant: Gallagher, Ken; Parties Present- Defendant: Gallagher, Susan; Parties Present- Defendant: Merchant, Robert; Parties Present- Defendant: Cabral, Monica; Parties Present- Defendant: Stoen, Ken; Parties Present- Defendant: Riverbend MHP LLC, (Fenton & Keller, John E Kesecker)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2016
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 09/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Financial info for Kaluaratchie, Charith: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00030674 Kaluaratchie, Charith $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Financial info for Kaluaratchie, Charith: Transaction Assessment $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Financial: Kaluaratchie, Charith; Total Financial Assessment $3.00; Total Payments and Credits $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Financial info for de Saracho, Frank: Fee Waiver $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Financial info for de Saracho, Frank: Transaction Assessment $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Financial: de Saracho, Frank; Total Financial Assessment $75.00; Total Payments and Credits $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.