This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 04:29:07 (UTC).

Floyd Smith vs. Mark Gleizer

Case Summary

On 09/09/2016 Floyd Smith filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Mark Gleizer. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Diaz, Monica and Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2057

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Diaz, Monica

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smith, Floyd

Defendant

Gleizer, Mark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meine, C. Fredrick, III

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Smith, Floyd; Awarded Against:; Gleizer, Mark; Amount; Damages: $7,500.00; Costs: $130.00; Total: $7630.00; Status: Granted; Status Date: 10/20/2016; Status Comment: Statement of decision: $400.00 per month for 18 months plus 1 $300.00 payment. Execution on the judgment is stayed so long as payments are made as set forth in this order. Payments are due by the 7th of every month. If any payment is not made within 10 days of the due date, the entire judgment becomes due and payable.; Party Name: Smith, Floyd

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Abstract of Judgment Issued

Abstract of Judgment; Comment: Amount: $7,630.00

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney for Floyd Smith; Comment: Old Attorney: Pro Se New Attorney: C. Frederick Meine III

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $8,328.11

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credits:$0.00 Interest:$673.11

Declaration Filed

Declaration

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Application and Order for Examination

Application and Order for Examination; Comment: Of Judgment Debtor or Third Person filed on Mark Gleizer

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Smith, Floyd; Awarded Against:; Gleizer, Mark; Amount; Damages: $7,500.00; Costs: $130.00; Total: $7630.00; Status: Granted; Status Date: 10/20/2016; Status Comment: Statement of decision: $400.00 per month for 18 months plus 1 $300.00 payment. Execution on the judgment is stayed so long as payments are made as set forth in this order. Payments are due by the 7th of every month. If any payment is not made within 10 days of the due date, the entire judgment becomes due and payable.; Party Name: Smith, Floyd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Order of Examination - Bench Warrant- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Notice of Hearing- Comment: Order for Examination- Bench Warrant Hearing set 3/16/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Other- Comment: OXBW- Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Bench Warrant Scanned- Comment: Ordered on 12/29/2017 emailed to FSO on 12/29/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Order of Examination - Bench Warrant- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued- Abstract of Judgment; Comment: Amount: $7,630.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney for Floyd Smith; Comment: Old Attorney: Pro Se New Attorney: C. Frederick Meine III

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Financial info for Smith, Floyd: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-61024 Smith, Floyd $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Financial info for Smith, Floyd: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Financial info for Smith, Floyd: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-50264 Smith, Floyd $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Financial info for Smith, Floyd: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Financial info for Smith, Floyd: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00011171 Smith, Floyd $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Financial info for Smith, Floyd: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Financial info for Smith, Floyd: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00031111 Smith, Floyd $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Financial info for Smith, Floyd: Transaction Assessment $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Financial: Smith, Floyd; Total Financial Assessment $185.00; Total Payments and Credits $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.