This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 08:07:25 (UTC).

First National vs Elimelche Palacios/UD/JUDG

Case Summary

On 10/17/2013 First National filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Elimelche Palacios/UD/JUDG. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9737

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First National Funding Corp, a Ca Corporation

Defendants

Palacios, Elimelche

Canales, Maria

Others

All Other Occupants

Palacios, Elimeche

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hubbell, Marlene A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 15-JAN-2014 by JVERBERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Money damages after 1169- Comment: In accordance with order signed by Judge Dale Ikeda on 01/13/14 judgment having been previously entered pursuant to CP1169, Court orders the money damages on behalf of plaintiff First National Fundign corp., a California Corporation against defendant Elimelche Palacios aka Elimeche Palacios, Maria Canales in the sum of: Past-due rent: $ 3375.00 Holdover damages: $ 2091.57 Atty Fees: $ 425.00 Costs: $ 389.00 Total: $ 6280.57 mgs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Minute order Judge Ikeda- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: J.Verbera Reporter: 2:00:00 Nature of Hearing: Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: J.Verbera Reporter: 2:30:00 Nature of Hearing: Money Damages -- Money damages granted. Attorney Louie Coronado is sworn and testifies. Copy of the rental agreement is marked and received as plaintiffs exhibit #1. The court takes judicial notice of 3-day notice and proof of service already in court file. Order signed on the record. Notice waived. mgs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 02:01 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Matter set for hearing- Comment: Matter set for Money damages on 01-13-14 at 2:00pm in dept #401. mn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for UDDI scheduled for 12/16/13 . Clerk's judgment entered 12/2/13. ja

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • Restitution of premises jgm- Comment: Judgment entered pursuant to CCP 1169 for plaintiff(s) First National Funding Corp. a California Corporation against defendant(s) Elimelche Palacios aka Elimeche Palacios, Maria Canales, and All Occupants In Possession on 12/2/13 for restitution of the premises only. 3725 E. Butler Ave., Fresno, Fresno County, CA 93702. Judgment applies to all occupants of the premises including tenants, subtenants if any and named claimants if any. ja

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Maria Canales. Not necessary to default all other occupants. ja

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt CLCE320548.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • Void Payment- Comment: Receipt Number CLCE320545 has been voided.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from GUAGMNU on 28-OCT-2013 by CYBARRA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCE319512.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 17-OCT-2013 by PHERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST NATIONAL FUNDING CORP. is a litigant