This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:13:58 (UTC).

Financial Credit vs Gregory Zurita/CC/DIS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Financial Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gregory Zurita/CC/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2076

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Financial Credit Network, Inc.

Defendant

Zurita, Gregory

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gubler, E. Warren

Gubler & Abbott Llp 1110 N Chinowth Street

Visalia, CA 93291

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Gregory Zurita on 1/25/14. 040414 jmo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. cg Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE325263.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Civil Complaint filed. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. JL Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: JL Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less