This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 14:36:42 (UTC).

Financial Credit VS De Los Rios

Case Summary

On 05/18/2010 Financial Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against De Los Rios. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Reedley Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0273

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Financial Credit Network, Inc.

Defendants

De Los Rios, Joseph

De Los Rios, Lucille

Others

Rios, Joseph D

Rios, Lucy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gubler, E. Warren

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2011
  • DocketWrit filed wholly unsatisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, wholly unsatisfied. Remarks: Case released per plaintiff's request. WRIT ISSUED ON 07/30/10. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • DocketCollection Case Review- Original Type: Collection Case Review; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • FinancialFinancial info for Financial Credit Network, Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # 12328 Financial Credit Network, Inc. $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • FinancialFinancial info for Financial Credit Network, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • FinancialFinancial info for Financial Credit Network, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • FinancialFinancial: Financial Credit Network, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CLRE12328.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • DocketWrit of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Tulare in the amount of $ 8853.05. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • DocketOff calendar- Comment: Off calendar for Collections scheduled for 11/18/10. Clerk's judgement entered on 07/27/10. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2010
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Lucy De Los Rios, Wife, mailed on 06/04/10. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLRE12027.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • DocketNotice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 20-MAY-2010 by JPRICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • DocketMinute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 20-MAY-2010 by JPRICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • DocketJBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. jp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • DocketSummons filed- Comment: Summons on Collections Complaint filed. jp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. jp Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • DocketDecl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FINANCIAL CREDIT NETWORK INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUBLER, E WARREN