This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:21:54 (UTC).

Fernando Garcia vs Blanca Del Rocio Robles/DIS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Fernando Garcia filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Blanca Del Rocio Robles/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale and Smith, Bruce. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1512

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Smith, Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garcia, Fernando Gomez

Defendants

Robles, Blanca Del Rocio

Robles, Heriberto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Cooper, Joseph D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for JT scheduled for 8/10/15 due to dismissal entered. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for TRR scheduled for 8/7/15 due to dismissal entered. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed with prejudice. cg Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Original Type: OSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:07 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for ADRS scheduled for 6/27/14. ADR Stipulation filed rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • ADR Stipulation - Mediation- Comment: ADR stipulation filed - parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Lee Jacobson rls

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2014
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Heriberto Robles, mailed on 01/23/14. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Blanco Del Rico Robles on 01/22/14. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • Filed proof service by mail- Comment: cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$370.00 was made on receipt CLCE323959.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Auto/Tort Complaint filed. ed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . ed Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet ed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by EDUQUE.

    Read MoreRead Less