This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 22:45:12 (UTC).

Fernandes Family, LLC vs. Carrie Davis

Case Summary

On 07/26/2016 Fernandes Family, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Carrie Davis. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Gamoian, Lisa and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5758

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Gamoian, Lisa

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fernandes Family, LLC

Defendants

Davis, Stanley

Davis, Carrie

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leifer, William H.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Fernandes Family, LLC; Davis, Carrie; Davis, Stanley; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Fernandes Family, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 2925 E. Ashcroft Fresno CA 93726; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Davis, Carrie; Davis, Stanley

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Premises Only

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1 to 5

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Writ of Execution filed wholly satisfied as to possession only

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Fernandes Family, LLC; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against:; Davis, Carrie; Davis, Stanley; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,095.00; Holdover Damages: $1,642.50; Attorney Fees: $290.00; Costs: $530.00; Total: $3,557.50

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Fernandes Family, LLC; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against:; Davis, Carrie; Davis, Stanley; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,095.00; Holdover Damages: $1,642.50; Attorney Fees: $290.00; Costs: $530.00; Total: $3,557.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Fernandes Family, LLC; Davis, Carrie; Davis, Stanley; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Fernandes Family, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 2925 E. Ashcroft Fresno CA 93726; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Davis, Carrie; Davis, Stanley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued- Abstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: Amount: $3557.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney: William H. Leifer New Attorney: Self

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Assignment of Judgment Filed- Assignment of Judgment Filed; Comment: Collectibles Management Resources

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Writ of Execution filed wholly satisfied as to possession only

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed- Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Financial info for Fernandes Family, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00001113 Collectibles Management $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Financial info for Fernandes Family, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Financial info for Fernandes Family, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00030163 Leifer, William H. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Financial info for Fernandes Family, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Financial info for Fernandes Family, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00026381 Leifer, William H. $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Financial info for Fernandes Family, LLC: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Financial: Fernandes Family, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $290.00; Total Payments and Credits $290.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leifer, William H.