Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/08/2019 at 15:45:04 (UTC).

Felicia Barrera vs. Fruit Avenue Housing Associates LP

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 Felicia Barrera filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Fruit Avenue Housing Associates LP. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Gaab, Kimberly, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Tharpe, D Tyler, McGuire, Rosemary, Black, Donald and Simpson, Alan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0061

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Gaab, Kimberly

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Tharpe, D Tyler

McGuire, Rosemary

Black, Donald

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Ohang, Larry

Barrera, Felicia

Alco General Contractors

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Lara , Eddie

The Parks at Fig Garden

Icon Commercial Contractors Inc

Kiser, Tracie

The Parks at Fig Garden Apartments

Dommer, Kaycee

Community Housing Works Inc

Icon Builders

Fruit Avenue Housing Associates LP

Ashlan Avenue Housing LLC

Conam Management Corporation

Parks at Fig LLC

Community Housing Works

Community Housing Works, Inc

Icon Professional Building Company

Alco General Contractors

Doe 1

ALCO

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gilmore, Robert G.

Pham, Thao T

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DeMaria, Anthony N.

Frankenberger, David J.

Cordery, Theodore T.

Other Attorneys

Mcbrearty, James F.

 

Court Documents

Opposition filed

Plaintiffs Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant; Comment: Plaintiffs Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike Punitive Damages from Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

HRG: 9/25/18 Second Amended Motion (No Fee); Comment: Second Amended Notice of Motion to Strike

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury fee deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of defendants

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Jury fee deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of plaintiffs

Notice Filed

Deposit/Payment to Fresno Superior Court; Comment: Deposit/Payment to Fresno Superior Court

Amended Document Filed

HRG: 8/16/18Amended Notice of Motion; Comment: Amended notice of motion to strike:

Answer Filed

Answer

Declaration Filed

Declaration in Support of Motion to Strike; Comment: in Support of Motion to Strike

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion to Strike; Comment: to Strike

Stipulation and Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: regarding records

Stipulation and Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: re: mental health records

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only); Comment: and Certificate of Mailing (L&M- Motion to strike)

Order Received for Signature

Stipulated Order re Mental Health Records; Comment: Forwarded to: 503 Order for: Stipulated Order re Mental Health Records

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 503 Stip & Order Regarding Records

Reply filed

Reply; Comment: Reply To Opposition To Defedants Motion To Strike Punitive Damage Allegations From Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint.

Declaration Filed

Declaration of Robert C Gilmore; Comment: Declaration of Robert C Gilmore

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Barrera, Felicia; Ohano, Larry; Fruit Avenue Housing Associates LP; Ashlan Avenue Housing LLC; Community Housing Works; Parks at Fig LLC; Conam Management Corporation; Icon Commercial Contractors Inc; Kiser, Tracie; Dommer, Kaycee; Lara, Eddie; Alco General Contractors; Huff, Lisa; Reynolds, Susan M.; Wilson, Anne B.; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Name: Alco General Contractors; Comment: Without prejudice - Punitive Damage Claim dismissal ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • HearingJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties; Time est. 15-25 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • HearingTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • HearingMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • HearingOSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingADR Stipulation Mediation filed- STIPULATION REGARDING ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Lee M. Jacobson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • HearingReferral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • HearingJury Trial Requested by Both Parties- Comment: Time est. 15-25 days

    Read MoreRead Less
156 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Fruit Avenue Housing Associates LP; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Barrera, Felicia: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-69284 Barrera, Felicia $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Barrera, Felicia: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Barrera, Felicia: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-45246 Barrera, Felicia $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Barrera, Felicia: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Barrera, Felicia: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-41088 Barrera, Felicia $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Barrera, Felicia: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Barrera, Felicia: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-01818 Barrera, Felicia $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Barrera, Felicia: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Barrera, Felicia; Total Financial Assessment $1,040.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,040.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Parks at Fig Garden is a litigant

Latest cases where Community Housing Works Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Alco General Contractors is a litigant

Latest cases where ICON BUILDERS is a litigant