This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 14:05:32 (UTC).

Federal Home Loan Mortgage v. Boone-McGinnis/UD

Case Summary

On 03/07/2012 Federal Home Loan Mortgage filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Boone-McGinnis/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0285

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

Defendant

Boone-McGinnis, Gail Patricia

Others

All Occupants

Belcastro, Renee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Boone-McGinnis, Gail

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Judgment - Restitution of Premises

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL39799.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Judg - restitution of premises- Comment: Judgment for restitution of premises only signed by Judge John J Gallagher filed and entered. 21546 Frontier Road Clovis, CA 93619 County of Fresno lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Minute order Judge Gallagher- Comment: Dept. CLOVIS Judge: John J. Gallagher Clerk: L. Irion Reporter: 11/09/38; 11/59/06 Hearing: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Appearing Parties: Plaintiff: Marlene Hubbell, Esq. Defendant: Patricia Boone - Pro Per Matter referred to Mediation No resolution reached through mediation The AKA name of Gail Patricia Boone is added by interlineation Judgment: For Plaintiff(s) Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation Against Defendant(s) Gail Patricia Boone-McGinnis aka Gail Patricia Boone Writ to issue for the premises located at: 21546 Frontier Road Clovis, CA 93619 County of Fresno Lockout stayed to: 9/3/2012 at 6:00 AM Notices waived. All present parties were issued with a filed stamped and conformed copy of the Judgment. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 01-AUG-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • Certificate of mailing- Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the MINUTE ORDER DATED 7/25/12 was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: CLOVIS, California on 7/26/12 . Parties served: ALL PARTIES lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCL38234.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 08-MAR-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 08-MAR-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 lmi Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • Summons filed- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • Financial info for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation: Counter Payment Receipt # 38234 Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • Financial info for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • Financial: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $240.00; Total Payments and Credits $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less