This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 12:37:36 (UTC).

Fatima Luna vs. In the Mix Entertainment

Case Summary

On 11/14/2016 Fatima Luna filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against In the Mix Entertainment. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2584

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Luna, Fatima

Gama, Luis

Defendants

In the Mix Entertainment

Vargas, German

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To:; In the Mix Entertainment; Vargas, German; Awarded Against:; Luna, Fatima; Gama, Luis; Comment: Defendants, German Vargas, In the Mix Entertainment, do not owe plaintiffs, Fatima Luna, Luis Gama, any money on plaintiffs' claim.; Party Names: Luna, Fatima; Gama, Luis; In the Mix Entertainment; Vargas, German

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Luna, Fatima; Gama, Luis; Awarded Against:; In the Mix Entertainment; Vargas, German; Amount; Damages: $1,000.00; Costs: $50.00; Total: $1050.00; Party Names: Luna, Fatima; Gama, Luis; In the Mix Entertainment; Vargas, German

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order filed

Order filed; Comment: Order on request for Court Order

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: Request for Court Order an Answer (Hold until June 29, 2017)

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Notice of Appeal filed by Defendant

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Small Claims case referred to Mediation.

Small Claims case referred to Mediation.; Comment: agreement reached

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerks certificate of mailing attached.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To:; In the Mix Entertainment; Vargas, German; Awarded Against:; Luna, Fatima; Gama, Luis; Comment: Defendants, German Vargas, In the Mix Entertainment, do not owe plaintiffs, Fatima Luna, Luis Gama, any money on plaintiffs' claim.; Party Names: Luna, Fatima; Gama, Luis; In the Mix Entertainment; Vargas, German

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Luna, Fatima; Gama, Luis; Awarded Against:; In the Mix Entertainment; Vargas, German; Amount; Damages: $1,000.00; Costs: $50.00; Total: $1050.00; Party Names: Luna, Fatima; Gama, Luis; In the Mix Entertainment; Vargas, German

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Order Vacating Judgment- Comment: See Minute Order dated 08/15/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Taken under advisement (Small Claims Only)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Case Status Review- Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing- Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the (Order on Request for Court Order ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 07/17/17 ) . Parties served: (All Parties )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Order filed; Comment: Order on request for Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request Filed; Comment: Request for Court Order an Answer (Hold until June 29, 2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Notice of Appeal filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims case referred to Mediation.- Small Claims case referred to Mediation.; Comment: agreement reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerks certificate of mailing attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Court Trial- Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Plaintiff: Luna, Fatima; Parties Present- Plaintiff: Gama, Luis; Parties Present- Defendant: In the Mix Entertainment; Parties Present- Defendant: Vargas, German

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 11/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Financial info for Luna, Fatima: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00037710 Luna; Fatima $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Financial info for Luna, Fatima: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Financial: Luna, Fatima; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.