This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:26:53 (UTC).

Faradibah Singh vs. Pao Yang

Case Summary

On 07/28/2016 Faradibah Singh filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Pao Yang. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark, Black, Donald and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2408

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Singh, Faradibah

Defendants

Yang, Pao

Select Education Group, LLC

Institute of Technology

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vogel, Brian I

Defendant Attorneys

Winn, Aaron T.

Pierce, Allison K.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service for Stipulation Re (ADR).pdf; Comment: Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Singh RFD.pdf; Comment: Singh RFD

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: declaration to demurrer

Case Management Statement Filed

Singh CMC statement 1 27 17.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Notice Filed

Singh Notice of Posting Jury Fees.pdf; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit- NO FEES ATTACHED

Order Received for Signature

Singh v. SEG Stipulation.pdf; Comment: Signed and returned to clerk''s office for further processing Forwarded to Dept: 502 Order to extend time to respond to complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Judgment

Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (without prejudice as to the 5th, 6th and 12th Caues of Action Only)

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

Case Management Statement Filed

Singh CMC Statement March 29 2017.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

CMC Singh v. SEG.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

POS Singh v. SEG.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: No. #5 was left blank if requesting monies this section must be completed.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: proof of service

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Singh, Faradibah; Yang, Pao; Select Education Group, LLC; Comment: WIth Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (without prejudice as to the 5th, 6th and 12th Caues of Action Only)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • CRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Req by Plaintiff; Est time 4 - 7 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 225 on November 26, 2018 at 1:00 PM in Conference Room 305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed- Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed- Request

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial info for Select Education Group, LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial: Select Education Group, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Financial info for Yang, Pao: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-29112 Yang, Pao $870.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Financial info for Yang, Pao: Transaction Assessment $870.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Financial info for Yang, Pao: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2016-04751 Yang, Pao $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial info for Yang, Pao: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial: Yang, Pao; Total Financial Assessment $1,305.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Financial info for Singh, Faradibah: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-32226 Singh, Faradibah $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Financial info for Singh, Faradibah: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Financial: Singh, Faradibah; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less