This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 17:26:00 (UTC).

In RE: The Disputed Claim of Justin Fairchild

Case Summary

On 04/23/2018 In RE The Disputed Claim of Justin Fairchild was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Black, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1408

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fairchild, Katie

Claimant

Justin, Fairchild

Defendant

The Disputed Claim of Justin Fairchild

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Claimant Attorney

Wells, David J.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Order to Compromise Claim (entire action); Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Judgment Type: Order to Compromise Claim (entire action); Party Names: Fairchild, Katie; Justin, Fairchild

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document

Order Received for Signature

2030532_645Order.pdf; Comment: Signed/returned to clerk's office for further processing Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim

Petition filed

1992154_648Petition.; Comment: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim (Petitions)

Petition filed

1990016_807Petition.; Comment: Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Civil case cover sheet

1990016_023CoverShee

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Order to Compromise Claim (entire action); Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Judgment Type: Order to Compromise Claim (entire action); Party Names: Fairchild, Katie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Petition - Comp Minor's Claim- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Uncontested; Comment: David Wells

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- 2030532_645Order.pdf; Comment: Signed/returned to clerk's office for further processing Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition to Compromise Claim of Minor- 1992154_648Petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition to Compromise Claim of Minor- 1990016_807Petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- 1990016_023CoverShee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Financial info for Fairchild, Katie: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-28652 Fairchild, Katie $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Financial info for Fairchild, Katie: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Financial: Fairchild, Katie; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLS, DAVID J