This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 04:30:38 (UTC).

Eva Guzman vs. Sheryl Smith

Case Summary

On 09/09/2016 Eva Guzman filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Sheryl Smith. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale and Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7111

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guzman, Eva

Defendants

Smith, Sheryl D

Smith, Sheryl

Other

All Occupants

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment Entered; Party Names: Guzman, Eva; Smith, Sheryl D; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Guzman, Eva; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 1550 W. Ashlan Ave #120 Fresno, CA 93705; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Smith, Sheryl D; Comment: LOCKOUT STAYED TO 10/30/16

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: Premises Only

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

At Issue Memorandum

At Issue Memorandum

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: All Occupants

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Sheryl D. Smith

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Comment: Type of Document: Order to Post GRANTED as to Sheryl D. Smith

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Declaration of Service by Mail RE: Answer

Answer Filed

Civil Document

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed; Comment: by Deputy Clerk

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment Entered; Party Names: Guzman, Eva; Smith, Sheryl D; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Guzman, Eva; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 1550 W. Ashlan Ave #120 Fresno, CA 93705; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Smith, Sheryl D; Comment: LOCKOUT STAYED TO 10/30/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: Premises Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Unlawful Detainer Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Proof of Service of Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • At Issue Memorandum- At Issue Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2016
  • Financial info for Smith, Sheryl D: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00031269 Smith, Sheryl D $0.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Financial info for Smith, Sheryl D: Transaction Assessment $0.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Financial: Smith, Sheryl D; Total Financial Assessment $225.40; Total Payments and Credits $225.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for Guzman, Eva: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00035125 Susan Lanier $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for Guzman, Eva: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Financial info for Guzman, Eva: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00031850 Guzman, Eva $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Financial info for Guzman, Eva: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Financial info for Guzman, Eva: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00031113 Guzman, Eva $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Financial info for Guzman, Eva: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Financial: Guzman, Eva; Total Financial Assessment $285.00; Total Payments and Credits $285.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.