This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 15:01:43 (UTC).

Erica Garcia vs Alejandro Garcia

Case Summary

On 05/29/2018 Erica Garcia filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Alejandro Garcia. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3171

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Garcia, Erica

Respondent

Garcia, Alejandro

Minor

Garcia, Jonathan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Final Judgment; Party Names: Garcia, Erica; Garcia, Alejandro; Garcia, Jonathan; Comment: Marital Status Terminates 12/5/2018. Petitioner's former name restored to Erica Candelario.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Comment: Copies sent to Box 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Documents sent to- Comment: Judgment to FLEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Request to Enter Default- Comment: as to respondent Alejandro Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Documents sent to- Comment: Default Desk - Default/Judgment docs w/envelopes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Financial info for Garcia, Erica: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Financial info for Garcia, Erica: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Financial: Garcia, Erica; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.