This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/23/2019 at 00:43:10 (UTC).

Eric Calderon vs Smile Care

Case Summary

On 09/10/2013 Eric Calderon filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Smile Care. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark, Simpson, Alan, Snauffer, Mark W, Cullers, Mark, Diaz, Monica, McGuire, Rosemary and Black, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2814

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Simpson, Alan

Snauffer, Mark W

Cullers, Mark

Diaz, Monica

McGuire, Rosemary

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Calderon, Eric

Defendants

Smile Care

Coast Dental Services Inc

Arora DDS, Navneet

Navneet Arora Professional Dental Corporation

Dempsey DDS, Melissa A

Tabibnia DMD, Gizel

Tabibnia DMD MS Inc, Gizel

Kohanzadeh DDS, Yoram

Kohanzadeh Inc, Yoram

Ferreira, Sergio L, Dentist

Aiello, Ronald T, Medical Doctor

Ferreira, S L

Kohanzadeh, Yoram, Dentist

Gizel Tabibnia, D.M.D. M.S. Inc.

Ronald T. Aiello, D.D.S., Inc

Diasti, Adam, Dentist

Dempsey, Melissa A, Dentist

Kohanzadeh, Yoram

Tabibnia, Gizel, Dentist

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hiyama, Dean

1285 W. Shaw Avenue Suite #107

Fresno, CA 93711

Defendant Attorneys

MEAGHER, DANIEL J

Kamel, Brian P

Pascale, Matthew

Malone, Bryan L.

Ray, Burdick M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without judgment

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Dean Hiyama Re Order to Show Cause

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Continued OSC

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: No record of Order substituting Doe Amendment to Complaint and no proof of service as to First Amended Complaint and Doe Amendment to Complaint.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Amendment filed

Amendment filed; Comment: Document:Amendment to Complaint

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Sergio L. Ferreira D.D.S. and S.L. Ferreira D.M.D, Inc Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Table of Contents of Supporting Evidence

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: [PROPOSED] ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORTIES AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Case Management Statement

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Request for Entry of Default of Defendant Robert T. Aiello, D.D.S., Inc.

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Dean Hiyama Re Order to Show Cause

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: allowing filing of First Amended Complaint

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of Eric Calderon in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment or In the alternative Summary Adjudication

Notice Filed

Notice of Motion; Comment: for Summary Judgment Table of Contents and Authorities

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: of Dean Hiyama

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Calderon, Eric; Arora, Navneet, Dentist; Navneet Arora Professional Dental Corporation; Dempsey, Melissa A, Dentist; Tabibnia, Gizel, Dentist; Gizel Tabibnia, D.M.D. M.S. Inc.; Kohanzadeh, Yoram, Dentist; Kohanzadeh, Yoram; Diasti, Adam, Dentist; Ferreira, Sergio L, Dentist; Ferreira, S L; Aiello, Andrew B.; Ronald T. Aiello, D.D.S., Inc; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Kohanzadeh, Yoram, Dentist; Kohanzadeh, Yoram; Ferreira, Sergio L, Dentist; Ferreira, S L; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Diasti, Adam, Dentist; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Dempsey, Melissa A, Dentist; Tabibnia, Gizel, Dentist; Gizel Tabibnia, D.M.D. M.S. Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Req by Both; Est time 5 - 10 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Reassignment of judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Full Dismissal; Comment: Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Actions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Calendar Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
323 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2018
  • Financial info for Calderon, Eric: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2018-00005383 Calderon, Eric $555.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Financial info for Calderon, Eric: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Financial info for Calderon, Eric: Transaction Assessment $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Financial info for Calderon, Eric: Fee Waiver $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Financial info for Calderon, Eric: Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Financial info for Calderon, Eric: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00019364 Kim Kazanjian $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Financial info for Calderon, Eric: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Financial info for Calderon, Eric: Fee Waiver $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Financial info for Calderon, Eric: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Financial: Calderon, Eric; Total Financial Assessment $635.00; Total Payments and Credits $635.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-PI-001

ATBI;NaEI‘; %?&gm&gggg {!#Vaniaeo.ga(f)e 88’87rj'lumbe!, and address): FOR COURTUSECONLY Attorney at Law . 516 W. Shaw Avenue, Suite 200 Fresno, CA 93704

TELEPHONE NO: (559) 230-0696 FAX NO. (Optional): (559) 221-2660

E-MAIL ADDRESS (Optional): attorNeY For (vame): Plaintiff ERIC CALDERON

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF FRESNQO sTREETADDRESS: 1130 "O" Street maiLnG ApDRess: 1130 "O" Street

cITY ANDZIPcoDE: Fresno 93724 BRANCH NAME:

PLAINTIFF: ERIC CALDERON

SMILE CARE; COAST DENTAL SERVICES, INC.; NAVNEET ARORA,

DEFENDANT: D-D-S:; NAVNEET ARORA PROFESSIONAL DENTAL CORPORATION,; F fi fi:I E i)

" MELISSA A. DEMPSEY, D.D.S.; GIZEL TABIBNIA, DM.D., M.S.; GIZEL . TABIBNIA, DM.D. M.S,, INC.; YORAM KOHANZADEH, D.D.S.; YORAM

DOES 1 TO 100 KOHANZADEH, INC.;| 6

COMPLAINT—Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death

AMENDED (Number): FIRST Type (check all that apply): SEEBNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT [ ] MOTOR VEHICLE OTHER (specify}: Dental Malpractice DEPUTY [_] Property Damage [ __ ] Wrongful Death Personal Injury [___] Other Damages (specify): Jurisdiction (check all that apply):

[] ACTIONIS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded [ | does notexceed $10,000 [_] exceeds $10,000, but does not exceed $25,000 ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000) 13CECG02814 [ ] ACTION{S RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint 1 from limited to unlimited [ ] from unlimited to limited 1. Plaintiff (name or names): ERIC CALDERON SMILE CARE; COAST DENTAL SERVICES, INC.; NAVNEET ARORA,D.D.S,;

_ . NAVNEET ARORA PROFESSIONAL DENTAL CORPORATION; MELISSA A. alleges causes of action against defendant (name or names): DEMPSEY, D.D.S.; GIZEL TABIBNIA, DM.D., M.S.; GIZEL TABIBNIA, DM.D.,M.S.,

INC.; YORAM KOHANZADEH, D.D.S,; YORAM KOHANZADEH, INC.; and DOES 1 to 2. This pleading, including attachments and exhibits, consists of tll1%0following number of pages: 6 3. Each plaintiff named above is a competent adult a. [_] except plaintiff (name): (1) [__] a corporation qualified to do business in California (2) ] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [__] a public entity (describe): (4) (] aminor {__] an adult (a) [__] for whom a guardian or conservator of the estate or a guardian ad litem has been appointed (b) [_] other (specify): (5) [___] other (specify): b. [_] except plaintiff (name): (1) [_] a corporation qualified to do business in California (2) [__] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [__] a public entity (describe): (4) [_] aminor [_] an adult (@) [___] for whom a guardian or conservator of the estate or a guardian ad litem has been appointed (b) [_] other (specify): (6) [_] other (specify):

CASE NUMBER:

[__] Information about additional plaintiffs who are not competent adults is shown in Attachment 3.

- | PLD-PI-001

SHORT TITLE: ‘ CASE NUMBER:

CALDERON v. SMILE CARE, et al.

4. [_] Plaintiff (name): is doing business under the fictitious name (specify):

and has-complied with the fictitious business name laws.

5. Each defendant named above is a natural person NAVNEET ARORA PROFESSIONAL

a. except defendant (name): SMILE CARE c. except defendant (name): DENTAL CORPORATION (1) a business organization, form unknown (1) [_] a business organization, form unknown (2) [__] a corporation (2) a corporation - (3) [_] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [__] an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) [_] a public entity (describe): (4) [__] a public entity (describe): (6) [_] other (specify): (5) [__] other (specify):

COAST DENTAL

b. except defendant (name): SERVICES, INC. d. except defendant (name): GIZEL TABIBNIA, DM.D., M.S., INC. (1) {1 a business organization, form unknown (1) {__] a business organization, form unknown (2) a corporation (2) [(X]. a corporation (3) [__] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [_] an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) [_1 a public entity (describe): (4) [ ] a public entity (describe): (6) [__1 other (specify): (5) (] other (specify):

Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 5.

6. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff. a. [_] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): were the agents or employees of other named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment. b. Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): 1 to 100 are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff. 7. [] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

8. This.court is the proper court because a. [_] atleast one defendant now resides in its jurisdictional area. b. the principal place of business of a defendant corporation or unincorporated association is in its jurisdictional area. C. injury to person or damage to personat property occurred in its jurisdictional area.

d. [_] other (specify):

9. [_] Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [__] has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [_] is excused from complying because (specify):

9. [_] Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [__] has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [_] is excused from complying because (specify):pAgE 3