This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 10:56:52 (UTC).

Eric Bejar vs.Cornerstone Packing/COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 10/31/2016 Eric Bejar filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Cornerstone Packing/COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, Donald, McGuire, Rosemary, Gaab, Kimberly and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3517

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Black, Donald

McGuire, Rosemary

Gaab, Kimberly

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mesina, Gerardo

Guerrero, Alejandro R., JR

Guerrero, Maria

Martinez, Hugo

Guerrero, Alejandro R.

Bejar, Eric

Gonzalez, Pablo Guerrero

Chavez, Peter

Vega, Jose I.

Rodriguez, Magalia

Bastida, Victor

Izazaga, Jose A

Espitia, Maura

Robledo, Gilbert

Jacinto, Juan Carlos

Remundo, Ramond

Marcos, Lopez

Defendants

Cornerstone Packing

Kingsburg Apple Packers, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wagner, Nicholas

Defendant Attorney

Moody, Patrick S.

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Order on Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( ) . Parties served: ( )

Case Management Statement Filed

1656023_285SecondJoi; Comment: Second Joint-Case Management Conference Statement

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Case Management Conference

Notice Filed

Notice of Related Case 16CECG03517.pdf; Comment: Notice of Related Case

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Calendar Setting Case Management Conference set for May 4th, 2017 is continued to May 11th, 2017 at 3:30 p.m. in Department 403

Stipulation and Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: to add Marcos Lopez to this action as a Plaintiff/Class Representative

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: (Order signed; Forwarded to clerks office for further processing) Forwarded to: Dept. 403 Order for: to Add New Plaintiff/Class Representative to Complaint and Order thereon

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Dec of Nicholas Wagner Re: Preeptory Disqualification

Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Request; Comment: Forwarded to Dept. 403

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Joint Case Management Conference Statement

Answer Filed

Answer to Complaint (Cornerstone).pdf

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service Cornerstone Packing

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2018
  • Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: of reassignment of judge for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing- Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Order on Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( ) . Parties served: ( )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Denied- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Order on Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition filed- 1.pdf; Comment: to request for pretrial discovery. Forwarded to dept. 403

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerk's certificate of mailing attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Continued Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed- Request; Comment: Forwarded to Dept. 403

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement; Comment: Joint Case Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2016
  • Financial info for Kingsburg Apple Packers, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Financial: Kingsburg Apple Packers, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Financial info for Cornerstone Packing: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-58430 Cornerstone Packing $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Financial info for Cornerstone Packing: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Financial: Cornerstone Packing; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Financial info for Bejar, Eric: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-20053 Bejar, Eric $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Financial info for Bejar, Eric: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Financial info for Bejar, Eric: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-49463 Bejar, Eric $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Financial info for Bejar, Eric: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Financial: Bejar, Eric; Total Financial Assessment $1,455.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,455.00

    Read MoreRead Less