This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 17:25:10 (UTC).

Equable Ascent Financial vs. Samuel Curbow/DIS

Case Summary

On 04/04/2012 Equable Ascent Financial filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Samuel Curbow/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0383

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equable Ascent Financial, LLC

Defendant

Curbow, Samuel L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Muren, Tara

Defendant Attorney

Curbow, Samuel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Notice of entry of dismissal- Comment: Notice of entry of dismissal and proof of service filed. mk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. mn Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • Answer filed- Comment: Answer to contract filed. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Samuel J. Curbow on 4/27/12. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCL38549.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . cg Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on CCR Complaint filed. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: cg Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • Financial info for Curbow, Samuel L: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • Financial: Curbow, Samuel L; Total Financial Assessment $0.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Financial info for Equable Ascent Financial, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # 38549 Equable Ascent Financial, LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Financial info for Equable Ascent Financial, LLC: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Financial: Equable Ascent Financial, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less