This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/01/2020 at 14:47:07 (UTC).

Enrique de Jesus Lopez vs Vianka Gil Lopez

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 Enrique de Jesus Lopez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Vianka Gil Lopez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gamoian, Lisa, Tharpe, D Tyler, Guerra, Amy and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3356

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gamoian, Lisa

Tharpe, D Tyler

Guerra, Amy

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lopez, Enrique de Jesus

Respondent

Gil Lopez, Vianka

Minor

Lopez Gil, Aiden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rusca, Rosemarie Emelia

Respondent Attorney

Lopez, Amy L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • Docket2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketWithdraw of Attorney- Comment: Attorney Withdrawing: Rosemarie Rusca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Guerra, Amy; Judgment Type: Family Law in Court Judgment; Party Names: Lopez, Enrique de Jesus; Gil Lopez, Vianka; Lopez Gil, Aiden

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketDocuments sent to- Comment: D 204: in court judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketDocuments sent to- Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment with envelopes sent to efile box

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketProposed Documents- Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment-Accepted Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketProposed Documents- Comment: Judgment-Accepted Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketJudge Guerra minute order. See attached.- Comment: Dept: 204 Time: 10:14 a.m. Judge: A. Guerra Clerk: V. Carbajal Reporter: M. Anthony Petitioner: Present / Counsel: Rosemarie Rusca Respondent: Present / ProPer Hearing Type: Notice of Motion, Other: 2107 Waiver, Bifurcation Other: Counsel states parties have reched an agreement. Parties agree that the Custody Order from 5/15/19 shall remain with one modification: 4.03 Easter Sunday shall commence at 10:00a.m. and shall conclude at 7:00p.m. Child Support order in Case 18CEFS00810 shall remain and will be attached as Exhibit B. Husband is to pay Wife $1317.51 for medical reimbursement at the rate of $100.00 per month commencing 7/1/19 and due on the 1st of each month thereafter. Parties waive Spousal Support and the Court will not reserve jurisdiction over Spousal Support. Parties are each responsible for their own attorneys fees. Parties do not have any community assets or debts. Status Hearing set for 8/6/19 in D202 is vacated. Parties are sworn and provide testimony. Attachment: JUDGMENT: The matter proceeds as an uncontested matter. Judgment is granted. Court acquired jurisdiction on 6/21/18 by Response. Judgment effective upon date of filing. All other issues are reserved. Attorney Rusca to prepare the Judgment and submit to Wife for review and approval.

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketDocuments sent to- Comment: FL Supervisor - Petitioner's denied fee waiver docs for tracking (with file)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lopez, Enrique de Jesus: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Lopez, Enrique de Jesus; Total Financial Assessment $525.00; Total Payments and Credits $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketInitial OSC/Motion - Re: Custody/Visitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDocuments sent to- Comment: Fee Waiver to FLEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Comment: Supplemental Dec Regarding Fee Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketUniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.