This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:47:35 (UTC).

Emma Sicairos vs. Lennar Homes Fresno, Inc./COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 04/20/2018 Emma Sicairos filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Lennar Homes Fresno, Inc /COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1391

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trust, Memory William C.

Alvarez, Cesar

Vanderheyden, Jason

Palm, Alexander

Palm, Melissa

Gomez, Cristina

Ponce, Mario

Guzman , Nieves

Flanagan, Vidi

Fadal, Diane

Barragan, Luis

Mata, Valerie

Gonzales, Cynthia

Isonio, Desiree

Gonzales, Cesar

Esqueda, Elizabeth

Krentz, Walter

Ponce, Margaret

Alvarez, Sandra

Barajas, Oscar

35 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Su, Joseph J.

Other Attorneys

King, Jonathan N.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Gomez, Cristina; Isonio, Desiree; Nevarez, Felipe; Isonio, Jacob; Barragan, Luis; Palm, Melissa; Memory William C Trust; Nieves, Miguel; Villanueva, Valerie; Palm, Alexander; Comment: Without Prejudice

Summons issued and filed

Summons on SAC 6-19-19 SCANNED.pdf; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons on the Second Amended Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons on SAC 6-19-19 SCANNED.pdf; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons on the Second Amended Complaint

Amended Document Filed

SAC FULL SCANNED 6-19-19.pdf; Comment: Second Amended Complaint

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

RFD (7 homes) 6-17-19 - Re-entered SCANNED.pdf

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: Lifting Stay as to certain Plaintiffs, dismissing certain Plaintiffs and adding Plaintiffs to the case

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Proposed Order Lifting Stay and Adding Plain; Comment: **Order signed and forwarded to the clerks office for further processing on 06.04.19** Forwarded to Dept: 503 Order for: Lifting Stay and Adding Plaintiffs

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: of Complex fee for Plaintiff (Fees received via mail, after rejection had been made on 5/30/19 for envelope #2943126)

Notice Filed

Notice of Posting Jury, First Appearance and Complex Fees; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury, First Appearance and Complex Fees

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Gomez, Cristina; Isonio, Desiree; Nevarez, Felipe; Isonio, Jacob; Barragan, Luis; Palm, Melissa; Memory William C Trust; Nieves, Miguel; Villanueva, Valerie; Palm, Alexander; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons on SAC 6-19-19 SCANNED.pdf; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons on the Second Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Document Filed- SAC FULL SCANNED 6-19-19.pdf; Comment: Second Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- RFD (7 homes) 6-17-19 - Re-entered SCANNED.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order filed- Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: Lifting Stay as to certain Plaintiffs, dismissing certain Plaintiffs and adding Plaintiffs to the case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Stipulation and Proposed Order Lifting Stay and Adding Plain; Comment: **Order signed and forwarded to the clerks office for further processing on 06.04.19** Forwarded to Dept: 503 Order for: Lifting Stay and Adding Plaintiffs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Deposit, payment,disbursment- Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: of Complex fee for Plaintiff (Fees received via mail, after rejection had been made on 5/30/19 for envelope #2943126)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice of Posting Jury, First Appearance and Complex Fees; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury, First Appearance and Complex Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • Financial info for Lennar Homes of California Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2019-01826 Lennar Homes of California Inc. $1585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Financial info for Lennar Homes of California Inc.: Transaction Assessment $1585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Financial: Lennar Homes of California Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $1,605.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,605.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Financial info for Palm, Alexander: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00006565 Palm, Alexander $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Financial info for Palm, Alexander: Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Financial info for Palm, Alexander: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-51945 Palm, Alexander $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Financial info for Palm, Alexander: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Financial info for Palm, Alexander: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-28316 Palm, Alexander $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Financial info for Palm, Alexander: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Financial: Palm, Alexander; Total Financial Assessment $1,585.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan N King