This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 05:14:33 (UTC).

Elyse Monticello vs Appleby & Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 Elyse Monticello filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Appleby Company, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Snauffer, Mark and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3022

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Snauffer, Mark

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTICELLO, ELYSE

Defendants

A California Corporation

APPLEBY & COMPANY, INC

Applyeby & Company, Inc,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sharifi, Pegah

Defendant Attorney

Sagaser, Howard A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 set for 6/19/17 at 1pm RM #104

Statement filed

Separate Statement; Comment: Separate Statement of undisputed material facts in support of motion for summary judgment

Notice of Motion

Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication; Comment: Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Request for Pretrial Discovery; Comment: No Action Taken per Notice filed on 11-30-16 from moving party

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference set for January 9, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. dept 104---Case assigned to Judge Kristi Culver Kapetan for all purposes

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint; Comment: Complaint

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Monticello, Elyse; Applyeby & Company, Inc,; Comment: with prejudice as to the Entire Action of all Parties and all causes of action

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement filed

Notice

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Steven Appleby in support of defendant's motion for summary judgment

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: Memorandum of Points & Authorities In support of motion for summary judgment

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: to withdrawl PTDC. Forwarded to Dept. #403 review

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Monticello, Elyse; Applyeby & Company, Inc,; Comment: with prejudice as to the Entire Action of all Parties and all causes of action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 4-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Summary Judgment- Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Howard Sagaser

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 10:07 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 set for 6/19/17 at 1pm RM #104

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2017
  • Financial info for Applyeby & Company, Inc,: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-05926 A California Corporation $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Financial info for Applyeby & Company, Inc,: Transaction Assessment $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Financial info for Applyeby & Company, Inc,: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-44467 A California Corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Financial info for Applyeby & Company, Inc,: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Financial: Applyeby & Company, Inc,; Total Financial Assessment $935.00; Total Payments and Credits $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Financial info for Monticello, Elyse: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-59279 MONTICELLO, ELYSE $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Financial info for Monticello, Elyse: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial info for Monticello, Elyse: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-41520 MONTICELLO, ELYSE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial info for Monticello, Elyse: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial: Monticello, Elyse; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less