This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 04:30:45 (UTC).

Elwood Quesada vs. Susana Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 09/09/2016 Elwood Quesada filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Susana Rodriguez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7110

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quesada, Elwood Ricardo

Defendant

Rodriguez, Susana

Other

All Occupants

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Quesada, Elwood Ricardo; All Occupants; Rodriguez, Susana; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Quesada, Elwood Ricardo; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 2374 S. Holly Avenue Fresno, CA 93706; Awarded Against:; Rodriguez, Susana

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: Premises Only

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Comment: Type of Document: Order to Post GRANTED as to Susana Rodriguez

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Quesada, Elwood Ricardo; All Occupants; Rodriguez, Susana; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Quesada, Elwood Ricardo; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 2374 S. Holly Avenue Fresno, CA 93706; Awarded Against:; Rodriguez, Susana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: Premises Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Proof of Service of Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession- Comment: Defective: #5 (d) does not state authorizing code section.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default- Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Request for Default Received- Comment: With Judgment Box #09

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Financial info for Quesada, Elwood Ricardo: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00034014 Jimmy Belmontez $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Financial info for Quesada, Elwood Ricardo: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Financial info for Quesada, Elwood Ricardo: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00033237 Quesada, Elwood Ricardo $285.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial info for Quesada, Elwood Ricardo: Transaction Assessment $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Financial info for Quesada, Elwood Ricardo: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00031883 Quesada, Elwood Ricardo $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Financial info for Quesada, Elwood Ricardo: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Financial info for Quesada, Elwood Ricardo: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Financial: Quesada, Elwood Ricardo; Total Financial Assessment $330.00; Total Payments and Credits $330.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.