This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:24:31 (UTC).

Elvia Vasques vs La Puente's Auto Insurance

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Elvia Vasques filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against La Puente's Auto Insurance. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark and Snauffer, Mark W. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3844

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Snauffer, Mark W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vazques, Elvia

Defendants

LA Puente's Auto Insurance Services Inc

Rios, Imelda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brown, Carl L.

Law Offices Of Carl L. Brown 2109 W Bullard Ave, Suite 121

Fresno, CA 93711

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order Denied

Order Denied; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Request for default judgment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: of reques for court judgtment and supporting documents

Request for Court Judgment

Request for Court Judgment; Comment: Request for Court Judgment Filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Settlement filed

Notice of Settlement filed

Amended Document Filed

Civil Document; Comment: First amended complaint

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: declaration of Elvia Vazques in Support of Application for Default Jugment

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document; Comment: First amended summons

Amended Document Filed

Civil Document; Comment: First amended cover sheet

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Order denying application for default judgment

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Continued OSC

Minute Order Attachment

Civil Document

Statement filed

Statement filed; Comment: Statement of Damages Filed

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Vazques, Elvia; LA Puente's Auto Insurance Services Inc; Rios, Imelda; Snauffer, Mark W; Comment: With Prejudice.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Defective proof: by mail Reason: declaration of mailing is not attached; came separate from POS

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Vazques, Elvia; LA Puente's Auto Insurance Services Inc; Rios, Imelda; Snauffer, Mark W; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:02 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed- Notice of Settlement filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Continued OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Summons and Complaint- Comment: Defective proof: served by sub service. Reason: declaration of mailing is not attached; came separate from POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Defective proof: by mail Reason: declaration of mailing is not attached; came separate from POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 16-DEC-2013 by LESPARZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt CVCE185116.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: le Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Vazques, Elvia: Counter Payment Receipt # 185116 Vazques, Elvia $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Vazques, Elvia: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial: Vazques, Elvia; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less