This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/20/2019 at 15:22:49 (UTC).

Elizabeth Lopez vs Guillermo Lucatero

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 Elizabeth Lopez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Guillermo Lucatero. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hopper, Cindy, Tharpe, D Tyler and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3195

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hopper, Cindy

Tharpe, D Tyler

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lopez, Elizabeth

Respondent

Lucatero, Guillermo

Minors

Lucatero, Julian

Lucatero, Zaylynn

Lucatero, Melissa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Final Judgment; Party Names: Lopez, Elizabeth; Lucatero, Guillermo; Lucatero, Julian; Lucatero, Melissa; Lucatero, Zaylynn; Comment: Default Judgment - marital status ends 06/20/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • 2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Comment: Default Judgment - marital status ends 06/20/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: Clerk: D Flautz Court Reporter: R Lundy Bailiff: A. Rivera Petitioner present Respondent not present Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date: 5/20/20 Time: 10:30 a.m. Dept.: 202 Other: Petitioner present and assisted by staff from the Self-Help Center. The matter is not called on the record. Matter continued for further case status conference. Petitioner to notice Respondent of continuance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Petitioner: Lopez, Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Return Letter- Comment: on judgment documents. All documents mailed to Petitioner in the SASE provided.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Documents sent to- Comment: FLEX: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Request to Enter Default- Comment: entered as to respondent Guillermo Lucatero

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Documents sent to- Comment: default shelf w/ envl

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2018
  • Request to Enter Default Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure- Comment: Final Dec of disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Documents sent to- Comment: Default w/ Envelopes to Default Shelf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Financial info for Lopez, Elizabeth: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Financial info for Lopez, Elizabeth: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Financial: Lopez, Elizabeth; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.