This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/09/2018 at 09:53:51 (UTC).

Eliza Martinez vs Boston Motors Inc

Case Summary

On 03/05/2015 Eliza Martinez filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Boston Motors Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0742

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Martinez, Eliza

Martinez, Victor

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Boston Motors Inc, a Calif Corp

Mejia, Arturo

Golden One Realty Inc, a Calif Corp

Great American Insurance Company in place of Doe 1

a California corporation

Mejia, Micaela

Boston Motors, Inc

Cross Defendants

an Ohio corporation

Great American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hinton, Alicia L

Kemnitzer, Barron & Krieg, Llp 2014 Tulare Street Suite 700

Fresno, CA 93721

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Labiak, Stephen L

Fallat, John L.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Great American Insurance Company; Boston Motors, Inc; Mejia, Arturo; Mejia, Micaela; Martinez, Eliza; Martinez, Victor; Boston Motors Inc, a Calif Corp; Mejia, Arturo; Golden One Realty Inc, a Calif Corp; Great American Insurance Company in place of Doe 1; Comment: With Prejudice

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Golden One Realty Inc, a Calif Corp; Comment: with prejudice

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Civil Document

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney:Gilbert Zavala New Attorney:Stephen L Labiak

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Civil Document; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Leon Tirapelle

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Answer Filed

Civil Document

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Civil Document

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Dba Golden Rates Insurance Agency and Proof of Mailing on 4-1-15

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Golden One Realty Inc, a Calif Corp; Comment: With Prejudice

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney:Gilbert Zavala New Attorney:Stephen L Labiak

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Civil Document

Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed; Comment: for Cross-Complaint

Answer Filed

Answer Filed

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: by Alicia L Hinton for plaintiff Eliza Martinez

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document; Comment: on first amended

Amendment filed

Civil Document; Comment: Document: To complaint to add defendant doe

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Great American Insurance Company; Boston Motors, Inc; Mejia, Arturo; Mejia, Micaela; Martinez, Eliza; Martinez, Victor; Boston Motors Inc, a Calif Corp; Mejia, Arturo; Golden One Realty Inc, a Calif Corp; Great American Insurance Company in place of Doe 1; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Martinez, Eliza; Martinez, Victor; Boston Motors Inc, a Calif Corp; Mejia, Arturo; Golden One Realty Inc, a Calif Corp; Great American Insurance Company in place of Doe 1; Comment: Complaint only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Golden One Realty Inc, a Calif Corp; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Name: Great American Insurance Company in place of Doe 1; Comment: as to claim for exemplary damages only as to Great American Insurance Company only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Golden One Realty Inc, a Calif Corp; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Requested by Plaintiff with estimated time of 2-3 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2015
  • Financial info for Mejia, Arturo: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Financial: Mejia, Arturo; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Financial info for Boston Motors Inc, a Calif Corp: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00005455 Zavala, Gilbert $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Financial info for Boston Motors Inc, a Calif Corp: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Financial: Boston Motors Inc, a Calif Corp; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Financial info for Martinez, Eliza: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00010225 William M Krieg & Assoc $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Financial info for Martinez, Eliza: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Financial info for Martinez, Eliza: Counter Payment Receipt # 200305 Martinez, Eliza $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Financial info for Martinez, Eliza: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Financial: Martinez, Eliza; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.