Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/21/2018 at 06:13:52 (UTC).

Edna Olivas vs. Paramount Farm, Inc./DISMISSED

Case Summary

On 06/10/2010 Edna Olivas filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Paramount Farm, Inc /DISMISSED. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary, Black, Donald and Smith, Bruce. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2038

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Black, Donald

Smith, Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Olivas, Edna

Olivas, Johnny

Paramount Farms International LLC

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Allen, Ross M

Allen, Ross M.

Paramount Farm, Inc.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Paramount Farm, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Bruce, Daniel A.

Gundy, Christopher Van

Hoppe, Theodore W.

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorney

Hoppe, Theodore W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Original Type: CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • Notice of entry of dismissal- Comment: Notice of entry of dismissal filed. le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for 225 hearing scheduled for 7-1-13. Dismissed gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed with prejudice. gar Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • Notice of entry of dismissal- Comment: Notice of entry of dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Dismissal - Other- Comment: Request for dismissal of Complaint filed and dismissal entered with prejudice. gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Jury Trial- Original Type: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Trial Readiness- Original Type: Trial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Dismissal not entered- Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: cannot dismiss "entire action" without consent of cross-plaintiff Ross M. Allen. gar

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • Financial info for Allen, Ross M.: Counter Payment Receipt # 160203 Allen, Ross M. $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • Financial info for Allen, Ross M.: Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • Financial: Allen, Ross M.; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • Financial info for Paramount Farm, Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # 142783 Paramount Farm, Inc. $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • Financial info for Paramount Farm, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • Financial: Paramount Farm, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $355.00; Total Payments and Credits $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • Financial info for Olivas, Edna: Counter Payment Receipt # 140691 Olivas, Edna $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • Financial info for Olivas, Edna: Transaction Assessment $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • Financial: Olivas, Edna; Total Financial Assessment $355.00; Total Payments and Credits $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARAMOUNT FARMS INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUNDY, CHRISTOPHER VAN