This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 17:51:42 (UTC).

Ebenezer Community Church of God in Christ, Inc. vs. Dale Bolden

Case Summary

On 12/22/2016 Ebenezer Community Church of God in Christ, Inc filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Dale Bolden. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Diaz, Monica and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4102

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Diaz, Monica

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ebenezer Community Church of God in Christ, Inc.

Defendants

The testate and intestate successors of Odell Moultrie, deceased, and all persons claming by, through or under him

Moultrie Mcalister, Dorothy May

Moultrie Harris, Patricia Ann

Moultrie Payne, Kathy Lynette

Bolden, Dale

Moultrie, Alfonso

Mckeller, Gwendolyn

Lee, Lela

Moultrie, Stevie Rydell

Lee, Richard

All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right, title, estate, lien or interest in the property described in this complaint which is adverse to Plaintiff's title or create any cloud on Plaintiff's title

Administrator of the Estate of Odell Moultrie

Moultrie, Phillip Cornelius

The testate and intestate successors of Odell Moultrie, deceased,

All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right, title, estate, lien or interest in the property

The testate and intestate heirs of Richard Lee, deceased

The testate and intestate heirs of Lela Lee, deceased

The testsate and intestate heirs of Alfonso Moultrie, deceased

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowell, David L

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: POS, Dale Bolden (ECC)

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint; Comment: Complaint for Quiet Title (ECC)

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Non-service Diligence Dorothy May Moultrie MCalister

Amendment filed

Civil Document; Comment: to Complaint Doe 4 per Order

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Forwarded to Dept 503 10/23/17 Ex Parte Order Permitting Doe 1 Amendment. Forwarded to 4th floor clerk's office for further processing

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Forwarded to Dept 503 Order: Application for Ex Parte Order Permitting Doe Amendment (Richard Lee Jr) Forwarded to 4th Floor Clerk's office for further processing.

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Amendment filed

Civil Document; Comment: to Complaint Doe 6 per Order

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement- 10/23/2017

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Bolden, Dale; Moultrie Harris, Patricia Ann; Moultrie, Phillip Cornelius; Moultrie, Stevie Rydell; Moultrie Payne, Kathy Lynette; Moultrie Mcalister, Dorothy May; Mckeller, Gwendolyn; Comment: without prejudice

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: Type of Document: Summons and Complaint Publication

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Gwendolyn Mckeller-return receipt.

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: for ex parte application to file amendment to complaint permitting Doe 5

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: permitting Doe Amendment 1 to be filed

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Bolden, Dale; Moultrie Harris, Patricia Ann; Moultrie, Phillip Cornelius; Moultrie, Stevie Rydell; Moultrie Payne, Kathy Lynette; Moultrie Mcalister, Dorothy May; Mckeller, Gwendolyn; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:31 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Publication/Posting Order filed- Application for Publication/Posting Order filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: Type of Document: Summons and Complaint Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: (Forwarded to department 503)Application for Ex Parte Order for Publication of Summons and Complaint; Declaration of David Rowell \Forwarded to 4th floor clerk's office for further processing

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified- Disqualification; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons (ECC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint; Comment: Complaint for Quiet Title (ECC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet (ECC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Financial info for Ebenezer Community Church of God in Christ, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-72427 Ebenezer Community Church of God in Christ, Inc. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Financial info for Ebenezer Community Church of God in Christ, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Financial info for Ebenezer Community Church of God in Christ, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-58869 Ebenezer Community Church of God in Christ, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Financial info for Ebenezer Community Church of God in Christ, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Financial: Ebenezer Community Church of God in Christ, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.