This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 05:38:31 (UTC).

DVP, L.P. v Thornton/UD/DISMISSED

Case Summary

On 01/09/2012 DVP, L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Thornton/UD/DISMISSED. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0009

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DVP, L.P.

Defendants

Thornton, James R

Thornton, Stephanie L

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McCormack, Sandra Kuhn

Defendant Attorneys

Thorton, James

Thorton, Stephanie L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Court Trial- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 2-22-12. Dismissal of the entire case filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. lmi Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Minute order Judge Fain- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: Clovis, Dept #1 Clerk: L. Irion Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Waiver of Fees Appearing Parties: Defendant: Stephanie Thorton Matter taken off calendar at the request of Defendant, Stephanie Thorton. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 08-FEB-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Hearing - Waiver of Fees- Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • Certificate of mailing- Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Notice of Calendar Setting was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Clovis, California on 2-7-12 . Parties served: All parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • Notice of Cal Setting Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 07-FEB-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2012
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on James R Thorton on 01/09/12. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • Answer filed- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Order: Fee Waiver Forwarded to: Judge lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCL37542.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 09-JAN-2012 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 09-JAN-2012 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less