This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/08/2018 at 19:46:28 (UTC).

XXXXX

Case Summary

On 10/21/2014 XXXXX was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y, Black, Donald and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3146

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Black, Donald

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bowman, Douglas

Defendants

Fresno County Sportsmen's Club, a Calif non profit mutual be

Starcher, Steven

Lopez, Frank

Lewelling, Carrie

Singh, Kuljit

Rodgers, Jerry

Pricolo, Chad

Burnett, Tim

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mayhew, Kimberly L.

5200 N Palm Ave #211

Fresno, CA 93704

Defendant Attorneys

Sagaser, Howard A

Pricolo, Chad

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: Kimberly Mayhew New Attorney: Pro Per

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Status Conference

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: From Chambers: Matter previously taken under advisement, the court now rules;

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: set aside defalut of Kuljit Singh

Answer Filed

Answer Filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: of Publication of summons and complaint 1st date 5-13-15

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: From Chambers re: CMC hrg set for 07/16/2015 reset mgs

Answer Filed

Civil Document

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Type of Document: Summons, complaint and copy of this order. Publication in The Fresno Bee.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Status Conference

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Mtn Dismiss

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: Defendants Evidentiary Objectiosn to the Delcaration of Kimberly L Mayhew in support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: CMC/Status Conference

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: CMC

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Statement filed

Statement filed; Comment: Joint Status Conference Statement

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Request for specially set case management conference before Honorable Jeff Hamilton

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: re: Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: Kimberly Mayhew New Attorney: Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Motion - Quash- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Kimberly Mayhew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2015
  • Financial info for Starcher, Steven: Counter Payment Receipt # 200852 Starcher, Steven $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Financial info for Starcher, Steven: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Financial: Starcher, Steven; Total Financial Assessment $930.00; Total Payments and Credits $930.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • Financial info for Bowman, Douglas: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00002805 Mayhew, Kimberly L. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • Financial info for Bowman, Douglas: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • Financial info for Bowman, Douglas: Counter Payment Receipt # 200455 Bowman, Douglas $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • Financial info for Bowman, Douglas: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • Financial info for Bowman, Douglas: Counter Payment Receipt # 195700 Bowman, Douglas $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • Financial info for Bowman, Douglas: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • Financial: Bowman, Douglas; Total Financial Assessment $475.00; Total Payments and Credits $475.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.