This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:46:54 (UTC).

Doroteo Mejia vs.Bonadelle Homes Inc./COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 08/26/2015 Doroteo Mejia filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Bonadelle Homes Inc /COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y, Snauffer, Mark, Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2706

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Snauffer, Mark

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mejia, Doroteo

Hazelton, Donald

Orante, Robert

Garcia, Gabriel

Espino, Miguel A

Pellouso, Rachel

Williams, Loretta

Donato, Junio

Black, Cody

Barnard, Berverly

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Bonadelle Homes Inc.

Donald P. Dick Air Conditioning, Inc.

Cross Plaintiffs

Central Distributing

BMC West Corporation

ROE 20

TV Gaston Construction, Inc.

Eddie F Young Tile Company

Advanced Insulation, Inc.

Northern Central Distributing, Inc.

ROE 13

Donald P. Dick Air Conditioning, Inc.

125 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stewart, Anneke J

Blye, Anneke J

Iniguez, Miguel A

Defendant Attorneys

Reid, Stewart D

Home, W Stuart, III

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Heller, Elliot H

Constantino, Matthew S

Hergenroether, Michael R

Other Attorneys

Sebra, D. Creighton

Purewal, Param S.

Fidger, Angela R.

Paige, Robert N.

Tollefson, Suzanne A

Cody, Kevin P.

Fischer, Todd A.

Parker, James C.

Hazelton, M. Troy

 

Court Documents

Order Received for Signature

Mejia - Proposed Order.pdf; Comment: PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to R.A. on 3/8/2018 Order for: Proposed Order Determining Good Faith Settlement on Behalf of Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG for GD Plastering, Inc.

Notice Filed

Mejia - Not. of Settlement.pdf; Comment: Notice of Settlement and Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement on Behalf of Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG for GD Plastering, Inc.

Answer Filed

CASR 05541 ANSWER SPECIAL 012617.pdf; Comment: Lexington Insurance Company on Behalf of Moren Air Conditioning and Sheet Metal, Inc.'s Special Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Barrons Tile Inc

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Association of Attorney filed

Notice; Comment: Associated counsel: Timothy R. Wagner

Order Received for Signature

Mejia SPM signed intervention order.pdf; Comment: ***ProBuilder's Specialty Owes $1435.00*** Order signed and issued. Ff to clerks office 10/11/2016, for further processing. Forwarded to Dept 402; Exhibit attached to Proposed Order for Leave to Intervene

Answer Filed

Civil Document; Comment: to Cross Complaint

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Order signed and issued. Forwarded to clerks office 01/12/2018, for further processing. Order Granting Good Faith Settlement

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 225 on July 31, 2018 at 3:30 PM in Department 402

Answer Filed

Mejia - Answer XC.pdf

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Tile Interirors

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Jury Fees Collected

Jury Fees Collected

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: of Jessica C. Foster in response to order to show cause re ADR Stipulation

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

196 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Mejia, Doroteo; Bonadelle Homes Inc.; Khamchanh, Don; Phakonekham, Ann; Orona, Miguel, JR; Orona, Margaret L.; Aguilar, Shannon; Barnard, Berverly; Black, Cody; Candler, Raymond A., JR; Carpenter, Blake; Donato, Junio; Garcia, Gabriel; Grewal, Gurmit S.; Grewal, Beant; Guzman, Sharon Jones; Hazelton, Donald; Hazelton, Beatrice; Kliewer, Kenneth; Lolkus, Adrian A Te; Lolkus, Sharon A Te; McCave, John; McCave, Andrea; Medina, Jessie Galvan; Moreno, Michael; Moreno, Dolores; Orante, Robert; Orante, Elizabeth; Padua, Mergin; Padua, Leondres; Pellouso, Anthony; Pellouso, Rachel; Rose, Tisha; Salas, Peter R.; Salas, Brandie; Sterns, Monty; Sterns, Carol; Tatum, Kevin; Tatum, Ashley; Ward, Ryan; Washington, Raymond; Washington, Megan; Williams, John W.; Williams, Loretta; BN 5233, L.P.; BN 5312 L.P.; BH 5233 L.P.; Bonadelle Homes, Inc.; BN 5233, L.P.; BN 5312 L.P.; Donald P. Dick Air Conditioning, Inc.; Elia Drywall, Inc,; Clovis Sanger Cabinet Manufacturing, Inc,; Been Enterprises; BMC West Corporation; West Coast Electric; Fenceworks, Inc.; Pre-Cast Mantel Pieces, Inc.; Builders Flooring; Overhead Door Company of Fresno, Inc.; Moren Air Conditioning and Sheet Metal, Inc; Valley Insulation, Inc.; Everlast Painting Company; Greene's Plumbing Unlimited, Inc.; Madera Roofing, Inc.; Fresno Shower Door, Inc.; San Joaquin Stairs, Inc.; Leonard Young Tile Company; Barron's Tile, Incorporated; Matthew's Quality Construction, Inc.; Atmos Corporation; Glass Tech, Inc.; Bestec Security System, Inc.; Arakelian, Inc.; Anderson, Eric; Alvarez, Ben; Hernandez, Jacqueline; Cha, Lee Neng; Dias, Kari; Espino, Miguel A; Fries, Vincent; Fries, Cortney; Lolinco, Raymond S; Lolinco, Rosa; Magana, Julio; Magana, Ausencia; Welch, Kyle; Rodriguez, Irma; Donald P. Dick Air Conditioning, Inc.; Broken Drum Insulation Visalia Inc; Accent Tile & Marble Inc; Advanced Insulation, Inc.; Bulrad Enterprises, Inc.; Central California Painting & Coating; Central Valley Overhead, Inc.; Eddie F Young Tile Company; Fresno Plumbing & Heating, Inc.; GD Plastering, Inc.; Gino/Giuseppe, Inc.; Hodges Electric, Inc.; John Ventresca Company; Ken Perry Tile, Inc.; Landscape Connection, Inc.; Northern Central Distributing, Inc.; Production Painting; Rosenthal Brothers, Inc.; Theodore Escalante Jr.; Tile Interiors, Inc.; Tom Besmer Construction, Inc.; Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc.; TV Gaston Construction, Inc.; Xtreme Fireplaces, Inc.; HHMM4 Concrete, Inc; Madera Roofing, Inc.; Ken Perry Tile, Inc. (Cross Defendant); Broken Drum Insulation Visalia Inc.; Brent Ferreira Construction, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Glass Tech, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice; Comment: (as to Defendant in 1st cross complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: West Coast Electric; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Been Enterprises; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Broken Drum Insulation Visalia Inc; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Elia Drywall, Inc; Overhead Door Company of Fresno, Inc.; Valley Insulation, Inc.; Everlast Painting Company; San Joaquin Stairs, Inc.; Matthew's Quality Construction, Inc.; Bulrad Enterprises, Inc.; Central Valley Overhead, Inc.; John Ventresca Company; Landscape Connection, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (as to Defendant in 1st cross complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Greene's Plumbing Unlimited, Inc.; TV Gaston Construction, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (as to Defendant in 1st cross complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Mejia, Doroteo; Bonadelle Homes Inc.; Khamchanh, Don; Phakonekham, Ann; Orona, Miguel, JR; Orona, Margaret L.; Aguilar, Shannon; Barnard, Berverly; Black, Cody; Candler, Raymond A., JR; Carpenter, Blake; Donato, Junio; Garcia, Gabriel; Grewal, Gurmit S.; Grewal, Beant; Guzman, Sharon Jones; Hazelton, Donald; Hazelton, Beatrice; Kliewer, Kenneth; Lolkus, Adrian A Te; Lolkus, Sharon A Te; McCave, John; McCave, Andrea; Medina, Jessie Galvan; Moreno, Michael; Moreno, Dolores; Orante, Robert; Orante, Elizabeth; Padua, Mergin; Padua, Leondres; Pellouso, Anthony; Pellouso, Rachel; Rose, Tisha; Salas, Peter R.; Salas, Brandie; Sterns, Monty; Sterns, Carol; Tatum, Kevin; Tatum, Ashley; Ward, Ryan; Washington, Raymond; Washington, Megan; Williams, John W.; Williams, Loretta; BN 5233, L.P.; BN 5312 L.P.; BH 5233 L.P.; Anderson, Eric; Alvarez, Ben; Hernandez, Jacqueline; Cha, Lee Neng; Dias, Kari; Espino, Miguel A; Fries, Vincent; Fries, Cortney; Lolinco, Raymond S; Lolinco, Rosa; Magana, Julio; Magana, Ausencia; Welch, Kyle; Rodriguez, Irma; Donald P. Dick Air Conditioning, Inc.; Madera Roofing, Inc.; Ken Perry Tile, Inc. (Cross Defendant); Broken Drum Insulation Visalia Inc.; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (As to Original Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Grewal, Gurmit S.; Grewal, Beant; Comment: without prejudice.; Comment: (As to Complaint filed by Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Fresno Shower Door, Inc.; Arakelian, Inc.; HHMM4 Concrete, Inc; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (as to Cross-Defendants)

    Read MoreRead Less
347 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2015
  • Financial info for Bonadelle Homes Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00035296 San Luis Obispo Legal Services $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Financial info for Bonadelle Homes Inc.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Financial info for Bonadelle Homes Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00034860 San Luis Obispo Legal Services Inc $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Financial info for Bonadelle Homes Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Financial: Bonadelle Homes Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Financial info for Mejia, Doroteo: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00019435 Legal Support Network $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Financial info for Mejia, Doroteo: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00019434 Legal Support Network $700.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Financial info for Mejia, Doroteo: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00019433 Legal Support Network $700.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Financial info for Mejia, Doroteo: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Financial: Mejia, Doroteo; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.