This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/26/2018 at 12:17:46 (UTC).

Donald F. Gemmell vs. David Polmateer/UD

Case Summary

On 05/18/2011 Donald F Gemmell filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against David Polmateer/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0633

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gemmell, Donald F.

Defendant

Polmanteer, David

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gemmell, Donald

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2011
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. als

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for UDDI scheduled for 06/22/11. judgment entered. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to David Polmanteer. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on David Polmanteer on 05/31/11. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • Restitution of premises jgm- Comment: Judgment entered pursuant to CCP 1169 for plaintiff Donald F Gemmell against defendant David Polmanteer on 06/14/11 for restitution of the premises only located at 142 Bullard, Cloivs, CA 93612. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 19-MAY-2011 by PNUNO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • Order granting waiver of fees- Comment: Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • Unlawful Detainer Complaint- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 18-MAY-2011 by PNUNO.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.