This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/14/2022 at 20:22:28 (UTC).

Donald Divilbiss vs. Lindsay Cunningham, Psy.D.,

Case Summary

On 01/26/2017 Donald Divilbiss filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lindsay Cunningham, Psy D ,. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, Donald, Dalesandro, Samuel, Ikeda, Dale and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0277

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Black, Donald

Dalesandro, Samuel

Ikeda, Dale

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Divilbiss, Donald L

Defendants

Cunningham, Psy.D.,, Lindsay

Martin, Rebecca

Barriontos, Ph.D., Lizzette

Keo, Lily

Syn, Jeanna

Intern Psychologist, February to April, 2014

Intern Psychologist, May to December, 2014

Niccolls, Reville

Bertram, Robert

Intern Psychologist, January 15, 2015 to June 2016

Kaplan, Howard

Lechner, Mark

M. D., Psychiatrist

Intern Psychologist, 2014

Ruiz, Amanda

Hathuc, Nhuhy

State of California, Department of State Hospitals-Coalinga

Felix, Monica

Intern Psychologist, August to November 2015

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Phillips, James C.

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

Civil case cover sheet

Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Complaint filed

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Summons

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Order Denying Request To Appoint Counsel ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on (9/6/17 ) . Parties served: ( )

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: of Jury Fees paid

Minute Order Attachment

10/05/2017: Minute Order Attachment

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

09/06/2017: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Civil Document

09/06/2017: Civil Document

Minute Order Attachment

08/31/2017: Minute Order Attachment

Request Filed

08/25/2017: Request Filed

Minute Order Attachment

07/27/2017: Minute Order Attachment

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

07/05/2017: Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Case Management Statement

06/01/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Attachment

05/22/2017: Minute Order Attachment

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2017
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party; Names: Divilbiss, Donald L; Cunningham, Psy.D.,, Lindsay; State of California, Department of State Hospitals-Coalinga; Barriontos, Ph.D., Lizzette; Kaplan, Howard; Martin, Rebecca; Felix, Monica; Syn, Jeanna; Niccolls, Reville; Bertram, Robert; Lechner, Mark; Hathuc, Nhuhy; Keo, Lily; Ruiz, Amanda; Comment: Without prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Pre; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:32 AM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:36 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Order Denying Request To Appoint Counsel ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on (9/6/17 ) . Parties served: ( )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: Order Denying Request To Appoint Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Pre; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:32 AM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Pre; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Divilbiss, Donald L: Fee Waiver $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of court fees and costs granted by operation of law

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Divilbiss, Donald L: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: Divilbiss, Donald L; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 502 Order for: Fee Waiver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less