This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 11:35:24 (UTC).

Donald Divilbiss vs. Lindsay Cunningham, Psy.D.,

Case Summary

On 01/26/2017 Donald Divilbiss filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lindsay Cunningham, Psy D . This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, Donald, Ikeda, Dale, Dalesandro, Samuel and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0277

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Black, Donald

Ikeda, Dale

Dalesandro, Samuel

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Divilbiss, Donald L

Defendants

Cunningham, Psy.D.,, Lindsay

Martin, Rebecca

Barriontos, Ph.D., Lizzette

Keo, Lily

Syn, Jeanna

Intern Psychologist, February to April, 2014

Intern Psychologist, May to December, 2014

Niccolls, Reville

Bertram, Robert

Intern Psychologist, January 15, 2015 to June 2016

Kaplan, Howard

Lechner, Mark

M. D., Psychiatrist

Intern Psychologist, 2014

Ruiz, Amanda

Hathuc, Nhuhy

State of California, Department of State Hospitals-Coalinga

Felix, Monica

Intern Psychologist, August to November 2015

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Phillips, James C.

 

Court Documents

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: Plaintiff's Request for a lawyer to be assigned

Waiver of court fees and costs granted by operation of law

Waiver of court fees and costs granted by operatio

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: Order Denying Request To Appoint Counsel

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer to Complaint

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Inmate Petition Letter for Transport Order

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: of Jury Fees paid

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Summons

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Order Denying Request To Appoint Counsel ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on (9/6/17 ) . Parties served: ( )

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Complaint filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil case cover sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party Names: Divilbiss, Donald L; Cunningham, Psy.D.,, Lindsay; State of California, Department of State Hospitals-Coalinga; Barriontos, Ph.D., Lizzette; Kaplan, Howard; Martin, Rebecca; Felix, Monica; Syn, Jeanna; Niccolls, Reville; Bertram, Robert; Lechner, Mark; Hathuc, Nhuhy; Keo, Lily; Ruiz, Amanda; Comment: Without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:36 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing- Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Order Denying Request To Appoint Counsel ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on (9/6/17 ) . Parties served: ( )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: Order Denying Request To Appoint Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2017
  • Financial info for Barriontos, Ph.D., Lizzette: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Financial: Barriontos, Ph.D., Lizzette; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Financial info for State of California, Department of State Hospitals-Coalinga: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00010978 Phillips, James C. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Financial info for State of California, Department of State Hospitals-Coalinga: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Financial info for State of California, Department of State Hospitals-Coalinga: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Financial info for State of California, Department of State Hospitals-Coalinga: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Financial: State of California, Department of State Hospitals-Coalinga; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Financial info for Divilbiss, Donald L: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Financial info for Divilbiss, Donald L: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Financial: Divilbiss, Donald L; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.