This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/06/2019 at 09:36:28 (UTC).

Dominga De Duran vs Martha Sanchez

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 Dominga De Duran filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Martha Sanchez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Black, Donald and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3505

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Black, Donald

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

De Duran, Dominga Catano

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Elenes, Agustine

Elenes, Martha G

Sanchez, Martha Daniel

Iglesias, Ricardo

Sanchez, Martha

Cross Plaintiffs

Elenes, Martha G.

Elenes, Augustin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Torem, Ron

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Blake, Lily D.

Buttry, William G

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC re-notice for 1/17/19 at 3:30 p.m. in Dept. 402

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address; Comment: And Fax Number.

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: of case management conference hearing and assignment of judge for all purposes

Answer Filed

2579729_145SignedAns; Comment: Answer to Cross-Complaint

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee)

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: OF POSTING JURY FEES BY DEFENDANTS MARTHA SANCHEZ AND RICARDO IGLESIAS

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties; Time est. 4-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ADR Stipulation Mediation filed- Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Tom Simonian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Deposit, payment,disbursment- Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Filed- 2579729_145SignedAns; Comment: Answer to Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Jury Trial Requested by Both Parties- Comment: Time est. 4-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Referral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2019
  • Financial info for Iglesias, Ricardo: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Financial: Iglesias, Ricardo; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Financial info for De Duran, Dominga Catano: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-69099 DE DURAN, DOMINGA CATANO $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Financial info for De Duran, Dominga Catano: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Financial: De Duran, Dominga Catano; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Financial info for Sanchez, Martha Daniel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-19252 Sanchez, Martha Daniel $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Financial info for Sanchez, Martha Daniel: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Financial info for Sanchez, Martha Daniel: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2019-00667 Sanchez, Martha Daniel $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Financial info for Sanchez, Martha Daniel: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Financial: Sanchez, Martha Daniel; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTTRY WILLIAM GEARHART