Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/27/2018 at 04:04:24 (UTC).

DISMISSED-Varoujan G Mankikian vs Mona G Sweidy

Case Summary

On 03/12/2013 DISMISSED-Varoujan G Mankikian filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Mona G Sweidy. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1396

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Other and Petitioner

Mandikian, Varoujan G

Fresno, CA 93730

Respondent

Sweidy, Mona G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • Notice filed- Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment and Proof of Service filed. lml 09/05/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Action dismissed without prejudice. 082613mhs Event: Dismissed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • Document sent to- Comment: Sent to JA supervisor Request for dismissal for processing th/8-20-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 10:15 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • Proof of service filed- Comment: Proof of service of Judgment documents filed on 6-21-13 filed. Served on Mona Sweidy by mail on 6-26-13. rb7-16-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CMC scheduled for 7-2-13 . Judgment entered 6-21-13 ddk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to: scanning 6-21-13 ddk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • Notice of entry of judgment- Comment: Notice of entry of judgment filed. copies to box #40 6-21-13 ddk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2013
  • Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense- Comment: Preliminary & Final jlm 03-27-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • Proof of service-summons filed- Comment: Proof of service of summons on petition-marriage with blank resp and comp/blank: Dec of Disc, Schedule of Assets and Debts and IED filed showing service on MONA G SWEIDY by PERS service on 03-22-13 . jlm 04-26-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 13-MAR-2013 by JCOHAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt FLCE199332.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes th/3-13-13 Event: Pet Disso Marr-no children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Financial info for Mandikian, Varoujan G: Counter Payment Receipt # 199332 Mandikian, Varoujan G $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Financial info for Mandikian, Varoujan G: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Financial: Mandikian, Varoujan G; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less