Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 11:40:22 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Tonya Espinosa

Case Summary

On 01/26/2017 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tonya Espinosa. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0619

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Espinosa, Tonya Lashun

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Millea, Amanda

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Comment: DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

Declaration Filed

DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS; Comment: DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

Order Received for Signature

PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS; Comment: Pending Review PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

Statement filed

STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT; Comment: STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: With Judgment

Notice Filed

Notice of Change of Firm Name; Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Statement filed

Statement of Classification and Location/Venue

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Judgment

Clerk's Default Judgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment; Party Names: Discover Bank; Espinosa, Tonya Lashun; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Discover Bank; Awarded Against:; Espinosa, Tonya Lashun; Amount; Damages: $15,580.56; Costs: $439.50; Total: $16020.06

Order Granted

Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Comment: Copies in Lieu of Orig.

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Judgment Pending Review Clerks Judgment granted 8/16/2017

Declaration Filed

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST; Comment: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

Declaration Filed

DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033; Comment: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Tonya Lashun Espoinosa

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Clerk's Default Judgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment; Party Names: Discover Bank; Espinosa, Tonya Lashun; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Discover Bank; Awarded Against:; Espinosa, Tonya Lashun; Amount; Damages: $15,580.56; Costs: $439.50; Total: $16020.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Los Angeles Amount: $17,927.54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $1,882.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granted- Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Comment: Copies in Lieu of Orig.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default- Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Received- Judgment; Comment: Judgment Pending Review Clerks Judgment granted 8/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Comment: DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST; Comment: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS; Comment: DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS; Comment: Pending Review PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Tonya Lashun Espoinosa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement filed- Statement of Classification and Location/Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Financial info for Discover Bank: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-88540 Discover Bank $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Financial info for Discover Bank: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Financial info for Discover Bank: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-04489 Discover Bank $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Financial info for Discover Bank: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Financial: Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLEA, AMANDA