This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:15:03 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Oscar V Murrieta/CC/DIS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Oscar. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2108

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Murrieta, Oscar V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lief, Amy

The Moore Law Group 3710 S. Susan Street, Ste 210 Po Box 25145 (92799)

Santa Ana, CA 92704

Lief Baum, Amy Elizabeth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conditional Settlement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Original Type: CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for 225 scheduled for 5/27/14 due to dismissal entered. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed with prejudice. *****box 130***** cg Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • Notice of CRC 225 Hrng Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 06-FEB-2014 by CPRENDERGAST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Conditional Settlement Reached- Comment: Conditional settlement reached and filed as to entire case . Projected completion date: 03/27/2014 csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Oscar Murrieta on 1/10/24. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE325481.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - lmi Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration pursuant to CCP 395(b): venue of personal, family or household obligations filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Discover Bank: Counter Payment Receipt # 325481 Discover Bank $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Discover Bank: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial: Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less