This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 00:23:43 (UTC).

Dillon Jay and Karina Jay, Husband and Wife vs. America's Kid Academy, an unknown entity

Case Summary

On 08/08/2016 Dillon Jay and Karina Jay, Husband and Wife filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against America's Kid Academy, an unknown entity. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark, Black, Donald and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2558

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jay, Karina

Dillon Jay and Karina Jay, Husband and Wife

Jay , Dillon

Defendants

Klatt, Richard

America's Kids Swim School, Inc., a California Corporation

Klatt, Lori

Klatt, Rick

Vincent, Kara

America's Kids, Inc.

Klatt, Lorelie

America's Kids Foundation, a California Corporation

SwimAmerica Family Swim School, Inc., A California Corporation

Lklatt, LLC, A California Limited Liability Company

America's Kid Academy, an unknown entity

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Georgeson, C. Russell

Defendant Attorneys

Frankenberger, David J.

Freeman, Jordan M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without judgment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without judgment

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury Fee Deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of Plaintiffs, Dillon Jay and Karina Jay

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Time has not elapsed from date of mailing of Statement of Damages.

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Date has not elapse from Statement of Damages serve date, also section # 6 is lacking date, name and signature.

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Proof of service of Statement of Damages is Defective. Service of Statement of Damages need to be served same manner as Summons and Complaint.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

Objection filed

Objection; Comment: Objection to request for entry of default as to America's Kid Academy

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 5-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME.pdf; Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:37 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ADR Stipulation Mediation filed- Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: (left blank)

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2016
  • Financial info for America's Kids, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Financial: America's Kids, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Financial info for America's Kids Swim School, Inc., a California Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2016-05401 America's Kids Swim School, Inc., a California Corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Financial info for America's Kids Swim School, Inc., a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Financial: America's Kids Swim School, Inc., a California Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Financial info for Dillon Jay and Karina Jay, Husband and Wife: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-24499 Dillon Jay and Karina Jay, Husband and Wife $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Financial info for Dillon Jay and Karina Jay, Husband and Wife: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • Financial info for Dillon Jay and Karina Jay, Husband and Wife: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-34464 Jay, Dillon $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • Financial info for Dillon Jay and Karina Jay, Husband and Wife: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • Financial: Dillon Jay and Karina Jay, Husband and Wife; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.