This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 14:22:06 (UTC).

Diane Hill vs. Zaid Altahan/LEAD CASE

Case Summary

On 02/28/2017 Diane Hill filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Zaid Altahan/LEAD CASE. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Cullers, Mark, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Snauffer, Mark, Black, Donald and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0676

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Cullers, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Snauffer, Mark

Black, Donald

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Williams, Alvin

Hardeman, Damian

Munson, Brooker

Jones, Ada

Hill, Diane

Munson, Kimberly

Martin, Michael

Griffin, Dawn

Defendant

Altahan, Zaid

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elder, Margaret

Defendant Attorneys

Park, Gordon M.

Czeshinski, Michael J.

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Comment: Summons

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of CMC and assignment of Judge for all purposes

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Thomas Simonian

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit/Request//Court Reporter; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit/Request//Court Reporter

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice of Entry of Order; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order Consolidating Action, Vacating Existing August 20, 2018 Trial Date and Setting Both Matters To Be Tried on Existing December 10, 2018 Trial Date

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Disqualification; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Disqualification

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: calendar setting

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Full Dismissal

Notice Filed

Notice of Related Case

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint; Comment: Complaint

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury fee deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of plaintiffs

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Hill, Diane; Williams, Alvin; Munson, Kimberly; Munson, Brooker; Jones, Ada; Hardeman, Damian; Altahan, Zaid; Altahan, Zaid; Martin, Michael; Griffin, Dawn; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Continued CRC 3.1385- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Full Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Continued CRC 3.1385- Original Type: Continued CRC 3.1385; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: of Margaret Ann Elder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Hearing continued from 5/28/19 to 6/3/19 at 3:30 pm in Dept. 402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • CRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Original Type: CRC 3.1385 After Settlement; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: re: Dismissal Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2018
  • Financial info for Altahan, Zaid: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-43234 Altahan, Zaid $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Financial info for Altahan, Zaid: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Financial info for Altahan, Zaid: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-28315 Altahan, Zaid $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Financial info for Altahan, Zaid: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Financial: Altahan, Zaid; Total Financial Assessment $645.00; Total Payments and Credits $645.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Financial info for Hill, Diane: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-30601 Hill, Diane $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Financial info for Hill, Diane: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Financial info for Hill, Diane: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-11236 Hill, Diane $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Financial info for Hill, Diane: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Financial: Hill, Diane; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.