This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/05/2019 at 19:19:14 (UTC).

Developers Surety and Indemnity Company vs. Linda Fuller

Case Summary

On 12/13/2016 Developers Surety and Indemnity Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Linda Fuller. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Snauffer, Mark, Diaz, Monica, Cullers, Mark, Pebet, Noelle, Black, Donald and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9949

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Snauffer, Mark

Diaz, Monica

Cullers, Mark

Pebet, Noelle

Black, Donald

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Developers Surety and Indemnity Company

Defendants

Fuller, Linda Lee

Crimetek Security Systems, Inc.

Blueline Rental

Fullwel International Group, Inc.

Fisher Metal Products

Salem Engineering Group, Inc.

Covenant Construction, Inc.

Fuller, Linda

Marriot Towneplace Suites, A Corporation

American Builders & Contractors Supply Co, Inc, A Corporation

Dunn-Edwards Corporation, a corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pagan, John M.

Defendant Attorneys

Rowe, Jeffrey D

Dicker, David H.

 

Court Documents

Order Received for Signature

MTD-Order.pdf; Comment: Pending review of motion on 5/22/17

Conditional Settlement Reached

NOS.pdf; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 1/15/19

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Continue Dismissal Hearing File forwarded back to Clerk's Office for further processing on 03/08/2019.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 Dismissal Hearing set for 3/18/19 @ 1 pm in Room 305

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Calendar Setting

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: CMC Rescheduled for 3/20/19 at 3:30pm in dept. 402

Order Granted

Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Comment: Order to continue dismissal hearing from March 20,2019 To May 22,2019 at 3:30 P.M. dept 402

Order Received for Signature

Stip-BF.pdf; Comment: **Pending Review** Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Stipulation for Disbursement File forwarded back to Clerk's Office for further processing on 09/17/2018.

Order Granted

Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Comment: Order the bond funds deposite with the Court in the Sum of $ 5,500 Plus Interest be disbursed as follows: $ 5,500 any accured interest to be disbursed to Developers in a check payable to Law office of Hausman & Sons.

Proof of Service

POS 5_25_17 - PDF.pdf; Comment: By Mail

Proof of Service

POS NTC of CC 5_26_17- PDF.pdf; Comment: of Mailing of Notice of Court Call

Affidavit

Affidavit-Fisher.pdf; Comment: Of Reasonable Diligence

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

RFD-Fullwel w prej.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal-Fullwel w prej

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Blueline Rental; Comment: Without Prejudice

Request for Default Received

Default-Dunn.pdf; Comment: Without Judgment

Proof of Service

POS Answer Signed.pdf; Comment: Of Mailing of Answer

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

RFD-Fisher.pdf

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Fisher Metal Products; Comment: Without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Blueline Rental; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Fullwel International Group, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Fullwel International Group, Inc.; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • CRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granted- Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Comment: Order to continue dismissal hearing from March 20,2019 To May 22,2019 at 3:30 P.M. dept 402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Continue Dismissal Hearing File forwarded back to Clerk's Office for further processing on 03/08/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: CMC Rescheduled for 3/20/19 at 3:30pm in dept. 402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: 1 to 3 days

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2017
  • Financial info for Covenant Construction, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-03490 Covenant Construction, Inc. $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Financial info for Covenant Construction, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Financial: Covenant Construction, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Financial info for Developers Surety and Indemnity Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-67108 Developers Surety and Indemnity Company $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Financial info for Developers Surety and Indemnity Company: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Financial info for Developers Surety and Indemnity Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-18229 Developers Surety and Indemnity Company $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Financial info for Developers Surety and Indemnity Company: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Financial info for Developers Surety and Indemnity Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-57245 DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Financial info for Developers Surety and Indemnity Company: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Financial: Developers Surety and Indemnity Company; Total Financial Assessment $305.00; Total Payments and Credits $305.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.