This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 13:40:08 (UTC).

Debra Brown vs. Wasatch Premier Communities

Case Summary

On 11/21/2016 Debra Brown filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wasatch Premier Communities. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Cullers, Mark, Dalesandro, Samuel, Diaz, Monica and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3800

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Cullers, Mark

Dalesandro, Samuel

Diaz, Monica

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brown, Debra

Defendants

Wasatch Premier Communities

The Landing at Fancher Creek

The Wasatch Venture Group

Burge, KayCee

The Wasatch Group

The Landing Apartments

Wasatch Property Management, Inc.

Dommer, Kay Cee

Camelot Lakes Holdings, LLC

Kay Cee Burge

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geoulla, Daniel D.

Defendant Attorney

Petrie, J. David

 

Court Documents

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James A. Dilling

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury Fee Deposit posted in the amount of $150.00 on bealf of Defendants

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Order Received for Signature

Order on Court Fee Waiver; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: Order for:

Civil case cover sheet

Civil case cover sheet; Comment: Filing date of 11/23/16 for Civil case cover sheet corrected to reflect filing date of 11/21/2016. Original filing submitted on 11/21/2016 rejected in error.

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Complaint filed; Comment: Filing date of 11/23/16 for Civil Complaint corrected to reflect filing date of 11/21/2016. Original filing submitted on 11/21/2016 rejected in error.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

CMC Statement- Signed.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed

P Resp OSC FTA-signed.pdf; Comment: Plaintiffs Response to OSC re FTA

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe; Comment: by clerk

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Req by both; Est time 4 - 7 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:37 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ADR Stipulation Mediation filed- Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James A. Dilling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:37 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury Fee Deposit posted in the amount of $150.00 on bealf of Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Referral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Jury Trial Requested by Both Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil case cover sheet; Comment: Filing date of 11/23/16 for Civil case cover sheet corrected to reflect filing date of 11/21/2016. Original filing submitted on 11/21/2016 rejected in error.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Civil Complaint filed; Comment: Filing date of 11/23/16 for Civil Complaint corrected to reflect filing date of 11/21/2016. Original filing submitted on 11/21/2016 rejected in error.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Financial info for Wasatch Property Management, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-50403 Wasatch Property Management, Inc. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Financial info for Wasatch Property Management, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Financial info for Wasatch Property Management, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-33123 Wasatch Property Management, Inc. $1305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Financial info for Wasatch Property Management, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $1305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Financial: Wasatch Property Management, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $1,455.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Financial info for Brown, Debra: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Financial info for Brown, Debra: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Financial: Brown, Debra; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less