This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:19:55 (UTC).

Deborah Allen vs AMS Servicing/DISMISSED

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Deborah Allen filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AMS Servicing/DISMISSED. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1657

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

Allen, Deborah

Bank of America, Recontrust Company

Defendants

AMS Servicing

Seneca Mortgage Servicing LLC

Recontrust Company

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party Names: Allen, Deborah; Allen, Deborah; Bank of America, Recontrust Company; Seneca Mortgage Servicing LLC; Recontrust Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 02-JUL-2014 by MMENDOZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 02-JUL-2014 by MMENDOZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Minute order Judge Ikeda- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: M Mendoza Reporter: 10:09:33 Nature of Hearing:60 Day Order to Show Cause Court Orders Case is dismissed without prejudice csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:01 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on 1st amended Complaint filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Amended document filed- Comment: 1st Amended complaint filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Case Management Conf Minutes- Comment: Order to Show Cause hearing set for 06/27/2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 401 for plaintiff for failure to appear and failure to serve csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 16-APR-2014 by RLSMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2013
  • Order granting waiver of fees- Comment: Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 19-DEC-2013 by THOBBS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Court Fees Waived- Comment: $ (Amount of fees waived for documents filed or services provided) Specify:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil complaint filed- Comment: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less